Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0268013 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0268013



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 709
21.11.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.11.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.11.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.11.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.11.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
18.11.1996 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
31.10.1996 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
31.10.1996 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
31.10.1996 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
20.09.1996 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
20.09.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
20.09.1996 Text intended for grant Opposition 19
11.09.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.09.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.09.1996 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
25.07.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.07.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.07.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
16.07.1996 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
04.07.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
19.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.06.1996 Claims Appeal 3
14.06.1996 Claims Appeal 3
14.06.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
13.06.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
13.06.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.06.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
13.06.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
11.06.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
07.06.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.06.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.05.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.05.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.05.1996 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
17.05.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.05.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.05.1996 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 2
14.05.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.04.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.04.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
27.10.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.10.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.10.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.10.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.10.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.09.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.09.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.09.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.09.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.09.1995 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
25.09.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.09.1995 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
30.05.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.05.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.1995 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
26.04.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
31.03.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.03.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.03.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.03.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.03.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.03.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.03.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.03.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
28.03.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
28.03.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
28.03.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
18.03.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.03.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
03.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.02.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
22.02.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
22.02.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
28.07.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
05.04.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.04.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.03.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
16.03.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
15.03.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.03.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.03.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
27.12.1993 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.12.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
13.12.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
18.11.1993 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.11.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.11.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
11.11.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
25.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.10.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.10.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.10.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.09.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.08.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.08.1993 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 1
14.08.1993 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 16
14.08.1993 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 4
11.08.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.08.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.08.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.08.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.08.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 8
02.08.1993 Claims Opposition 4
02.08.1993 Description Opposition 11
02.08.1993 Drawings Opposition 8
02.08.1993 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
02.08.1993 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.1993 Means of redress Opposition 1
02.08.1993 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
26.07.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
26.07.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
22.07.1993 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
18.06.1993 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
18.06.1993 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
07.06.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.06.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.06.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.06.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1993 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
13.05.1993 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.05.1993 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
05.05.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.04.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.04.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.04.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.04.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.04.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.04.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.04.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
28.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.04.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.04.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.04.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
26.04.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
26.04.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
26.04.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
26.04.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
26.04.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
26.04.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
26.04.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
14.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
08.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.03.1993 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.1992 Claims Opposition 2
07.12.1992 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
04.12.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 13
24.09.1992 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.09.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.08.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.08.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.08.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.08.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
01.08.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.08.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.07.1992 N/A Opposition 1
17.07.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.07.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.07.1992 Text intended for grant Opposition 1
10.07.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.07.1992 N/A Opposition 1
10.07.1992 N/A Opposition 1
10.07.1992 N/A Opposition 1
10.07.1992 Request for documents Opposition 1
10.07.1992 Request for documents Opposition 1
07.07.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.07.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
02.07.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
01.07.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
01.07.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.07.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
01.07.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.06.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.06.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.06.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
24.06.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
22.08.1991 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.03.1991 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.03.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.03.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.03.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
11.03.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.11.1990 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
13.11.1990 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
31.10.1990 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.09.1990 Annex Search / examination 1
12.09.1990 Claims Search / examination 3
12.09.1990 Description Search / examination 14
12.09.1990 Drawings Search / examination 5
12.09.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.09.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
31.08.1990 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.05.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.04.1989 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.04.1989 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
04.04.1989 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
06.02.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.02.1989 European search report Search / examination 2
13.09.1988 General enquiry Search / examination 1
13.04.1988 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.07.1987 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.07.1987 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.1987 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 2
04.06.1987 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.06.1987 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
04.06.1987 Claims Search / examination 5
04.06.1987 Description Search / examination 26
04.06.1987 Drawings Search / examination 10
04.06.1987 Priority document Search / examination 20
04.06.1987 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6