Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0249819

EP0249819 - Cardiac pacer for pacing a human heart [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  03.12.1999
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pacesetter AB
175 84 Järfälla / SE
[1998/11]
Former [1995/15]For all designated states
Pacesetter AB
Röntgenvägen 2
S-171 95 Solna / SE
Former [1987/52]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Elmqvist, Hakan
Sunnerdahlsv. 7
S-16138 Bromma / SE
02 / Lekholm, Anders
Gnejsvaegen 4
S-16139 Bromma / SE
03 / Hedberg, Sven-Erik
Odonstigen 5
S-19631 Mungsängen / SE
04 / Amundson, David C.
Lillaengsgatan 25
S-16152 Bromma / SE
[1987/52]
Representative(s)Harrison, Michael Charles , et al
Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]Harrison, Michael Charles , et al
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
Former [1995/15]Lettström, Richard Wilhelm
H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137
S-103 62 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date87108102.204.06.1987
[1987/52]
Priority number, dateUS1986087459716.06.1986         Original published format: US 874597
[1987/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0249819
Date:23.12.1987
Language:DE
[1987/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0249819
Date:29.04.1992
Language:DE
[1992/18]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0249819
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.1987
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/365
[1987/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1987/52]
TitleGerman:Herzschrittmacher zur Stimulierung des menschlichen Herzens[1987/52]
English:Cardiac pacer for pacing a human heart[1987/52]
French:Stimulateur cardiaque pour entraîner le coeur humain[1987/52]
Examination procedure21.06.1988Examination requested  [1988/33]
28.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.11.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.1992Fee for grant paid
28.01.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.01.1993  24.02.1993  ADMISSIBLE
BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin
Woermannkehre 1
D-12359 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Christiansen, Henning
Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45
D-14195 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1993/13]
Opponent(s)01  29.01.1993  24.02.1993  ADMISSIBLE
BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin
Woermannkehre 1
D-12359 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45
D-14195 Berlin / DE
04.03.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.05.1993Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.11.1993Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
31.03.1994Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
14.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.1995Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.11.1995Date of oral proceedings
28.12.1995Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.12.1995Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.07.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.09.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.11.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition04.03.1996Appeal received No.  T0227/96
25.04.1996Statement of grounds filed
28.07.1999Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
28.07.1999Date of oral proceedings
10.08.1999Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL29.04.1992
SE29.04.1992
GB04.06.1999
[2003/07]
Former [2001/05]SE29.04.1992
GB04.06.1999
Former [1992/47]SE29.04.1992
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0135911  (PLICCHI GIANNI [IT], et al)
 [A]  - BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 9, no. 3, January 1976, pages 177-180, Plenum Publishing Corp., New York, US; B.I. MAZHHBICH et al.: "An electroplethysmograph for investigating regional lung function"
by applicantEP0249818
 EP0089014
 EP0249821
 US3593718
 EP0135911
 EP0218007