Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0249964

EP0249964 - Polycarbonate resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  07.05.1993
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD.
3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8350 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/52]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD.
3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hongo, Masafumi
9-14, Nishisakae-2-chome
Otake-shi / JP
02 / Shigemitsu, Hideyuki
2-6-404, Kurokawa-3-chome
Otake-shi / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Naoki
1665-32, Onocho
Saeki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP
04 / Yanagase, Akira
4-11, Misonodai
Otake-shi / JP
[1987/52]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/52]TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date87108701.116.06.1987
[1987/52]
Priority number, dateJP1986014063617.06.1986         Original published format: JP 14063686
JP1986016553716.07.1986         Original published format: JP 16553786
[1987/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0249964
Date:23.12.1987
Language:EN
[1987/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0249964
Date:20.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1988
ClassificationInternational:C08L69/00, C08L67/02, // (C08L69/00, 67:02, 51:08),(C08L67/02, 69:00, 51:08)
[1987/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/52]
TitleGerman:Polykarbonatharz-Zusammensetzung[1987/52]
English:Polycarbonate resin composition[1987/52]
French:Composition résineuse de polycarbonate[1987/52]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure05.12.1988Examination requested  [1989/05]
09.11.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.1992Date of oral proceedings
04.02.1993Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/26]
04.02.1993Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.02.1993Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2376189  (BASF AG [DE]);
 [AD]EP0080767  (STAMICARBON [NL])