blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0254264


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.08.1991 No opposition filed within time limit published on  23.10.1991 [1991/43]
15.09.1990 (Expected) grant published on  31.10.1990 [1990/44]
08.09.1989 First examination report
02.09.1988 Request for examination filed published on  19.10.1988 [1988/42]
19.05.1988 Publication of search report published on  06.07.1988 [1988/27]
28.03.1988 Change - classification published on  18.05.1988 [1988/20]
28.03.1988 Change - classification published on  18.05.1988 [1988/20]
12.12.1987 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.01.1988 [1988/04]