blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0254264
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE3765867D 06.12.1990D1
Priority number Date
DE3625258 25.07.1986
DE3765867 21.07.1987
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0254264Global Dossier 31.10.1990B1
EP0254264 06.07.1988A3
EP0254264 27.01.1988A2
Priority number Date
DE3625258 25.07.1986
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU598838B 05.07.1990B2
AU7610287 28.01.1988A
Priority number Date
DE3625258 25.07.1986
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE3625258 04.02.1988A1
Priority number Date
DE3625258 25.07.1986
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2019343 16.06.1991B3
Priority number Date
DE3625258 25.07.1986
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IN169969 18.01.1992B
Priority number Date
DE3625258 25.07.1986
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA8705452 30.03.1988B
Priority number Date
DE3625258 25.07.1986