blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0254264

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
FR 
 IT 
Examination procedure24.07.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted31.10.1990
Opposition procedure01.08.1991No opposition filed within time limit published on 23.10.1991 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:27.01.1988 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE ES FR IT
 
Event date:18.05.1988 
Event description:MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F42B 5/30
 
Event date:06.07.1988 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE ES FR IT
 
Event date:19.10.1988 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19880830
 
Event date:25.10.1989 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19890913
 
Event date:31.10.1990 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR IT
 
Event date:06.12.1990 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3765867
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19901206
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.12.1990 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.
 
Event date:11.01.1991 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:31.07.1991 
Event description:IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:23.10.1991 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:06.07.2001 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20010706
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:22.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20020722
 
Event date:16.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20030811
 
Event date:18.07.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20050718
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:11.08.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20050811
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:09.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:09.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
 
Event date:31.07.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20060731
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:01.02.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070201
 
Event date:04.05.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20070330
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060731