Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0254264

EP0254264 - Process for decreasing friction in the manufacture of cartridge tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.1991
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.10.1991 [1991/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/04]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gebler, Horst, Dr.
Wingertstrasse 5
D-6070 Langen / DE
02 / Pfahler, Gerhard, Dr.
Karlsbader Strasse 27
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
03 / Schindler, Arnold, Dr.
Völklinger Weg 44
D-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[1988/04]
Application number, filing date87110528.421.07.1987
[1988/04]
Priority number, dateDE1986362525825.07.1986         Original published format: DE 3625258
[1988/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0254264
Date:27.01.1988
Language:DE
[1988/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0254264
Date:06.07.1988
Language:DE
[1988/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0254264
Date:31.10.1990
Language:DE
[1990/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.1988
ClassificationInternational:F42B5/30, B29C55/26, C08L23/06
[1988/20]
Former International [1988/04]C08L23/06, B29C55/26, F42B5/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [1988/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verminderung der Reibungskräfte bei der Herstellung von Kartuschenrohren[1988/04]
English:Process for decreasing friction in the manufacture of cartridge tubes[1988/04]
French:Procédé pour diminuer les forces de friction pendant la fabrication de tubes pour cartouches[1988/04]
Examination procedure30.08.1988Examination requested  [1988/42]
13.09.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.12.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.04.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.1990Fee for grant paid
24.07.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.08.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4565131  (BUCHNER DELMER B [US]);
 [Y]CA860034  (FED CARTRIDGE CORP);
 [A]US3108981  (CLARK CLAYTON F, et al);
 [A]DE2546237  (SHOWA YUKA KK)