Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0260407

EP0260407 - Process for the recovery of beer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.07.1997
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Westfalia Separator AG
Werner-Habig-Strasse 1
59302 Oelde / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/12]For all designated states
Westfalia Separator AG
Werner-Habig-Strasse 1, Postfach 3720
D-59302 Oelde / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Swinkels, Wilhelmus J.P.M., Dipl.-Braumeister
Koppelstraat 8
NL-5741 GC Beek en Donk / NL
02 / Wackerbauer, Karl, Prof. Dr.-Ing.
Artuswall 13
D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE
03 / Stein, Udo
Twieluchtstrasse 6
D-4730 Ahlen / DE
[1988/12]
Application number, filing date87110584.722.07.1987
[1988/12]
Priority number, dateDE1986363147016.09.1986         Original published format: DE 3631470
[1988/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0260407
Date:23.03.1988
Language:DE
[1988/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0260407
Date:28.09.1988
Language:DE
[1988/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0260407
Date:02.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.1988
ClassificationInternational:C12C11/00, C12F3/06
[1988/12]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1988/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Bier[1988/12]
English:Process for the recovery of beer[1988/12]
French:Procédé pour la récupération de bière[1988/12]
Examination procedure24.07.1987Examination requested  [1988/12]
07.03.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.07.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.1991Fee for grant paid
12.09.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.09.1992  29.10.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa-Laval Food Engineering AB
Box 64
S-22100 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Ruschke, Hans Edvard
Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen
Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/36]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.1992  29.10.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa-Laval Food Engineering AB
Box 64
S-22100 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Ruschke, Hans Edvard
RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
Former [1992/48]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.1992  29.10.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa-Laval Food Engineering AB
Box 64
S-22100 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing.
Pienzenauerstrasse 2
D-81679 München / DE
03.11.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.02.1993Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.02.1994Date of oral proceedings
15.03.1994Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.06.1997Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.06.1997Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/34]
Appeal following opposition24.05.1994Appeal received No.  T0438/94
15.07.1994Statement of grounds filed
13.06.1997Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1234317
 [Y]  - L. NARZISS: "Abriss der Bierbrauerei", 4. Auflage, 1980, Seiten 307-308, Ferdinand Enke Verlag, Stuttgart, DE
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 81, Nr. 13, 30. September 1974, Seite 350, Zusammenfassung Nr. 76454u, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.C. WALKLIN: "Separation problems in the manufacture of yeast extract", & FILTR. SEPAR. 1974, 11(3), 265-6, 268, 288
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 84, Nr. 13, 29. März 1976, Seite 361, Zusammenfassung Nr. 87901a, Columbus, Ohio, US; E. BACA: "Utilization of yeast les-by-product in beer production", & PRZEM. FERMENT. ROLNY 1975, 19(10), 11-13
by applicantGB1234317