Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0260407 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0260407



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 539
06.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
01.07.1997 Notice drawing attention to increase of renewal fee Opposition 1
19.06.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.06.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 40
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.06.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
12.06.1997 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
09.06.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
09.06.1997 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
09.06.1997 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
06.06.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.06.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
05.06.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
28.05.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.05.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
15.01.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.01.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.01.1997 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 3
04.12.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
04.12.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
23.02.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.02.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.01.1995 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
10.01.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.01.1995 F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation Appeal 1
03.01.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.12.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
27.10.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.10.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
01.08.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.07.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.07.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
23.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
09.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.06.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
03.06.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.06.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.05.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.03.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.03.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.03.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.03.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.03.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
15.03.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 15
15.03.1994 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
15.03.1994 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
15.03.1994 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
24.02.1994 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
07.02.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.02.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.02.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
26.10.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.10.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.10.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 7
20.10.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.10.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
28.09.1993 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.09.1993 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.09.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.09.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
11.03.1993 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.03.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
17.02.1993 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
03.11.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.11.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.10.1992 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
16.10.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.10.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.09.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.09.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.12.1991 Claims Search / examination 1
07.12.1991 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
03.12.1991 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
26.11.1991 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.09.1991 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.09.1991 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.09.1991 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
03.07.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
22.06.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.06.1991 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.06.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.06.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
08.05.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.04.1991 Claims Search / examination 3
19.04.1991 Description Search / examination 5
19.04.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.03.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.10.1988 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.10.1988 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.09.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
09.08.1988 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.08.1988 European search report Search / examination 3
10.02.1988 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.08.1987 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.08.1987 Priority document Search / examination 11
22.07.1987 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.07.1987 Claims Search / examination 4
22.07.1987 Description Search / examination 7
22.07.1987 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.1987 Drawings Search / examination 1
22.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
22.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
22.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
22.07.1987 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5