Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0268044

EP0268044 - Compound label to be adhered to an object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.02.1997
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.1997Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 24.09.1997 [1997/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jos. Hunkeler AG Fabrik für graphische Maschinen
Bahnhofstrasse 252
CH-4806 Wikon / CH
[N/P]
Former [1988/21]For all designated states
Jos. Hunkeler AG Fabrik für graphische Maschinen
Bahnhofstrasse 252
CH-4806 Wikon / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Hunkeler, Franz
Rebbergstrasse 29
CH-4800 Zofingen / CH
02 / Rey, Max
Rebbergstrasse 18
CH-5107 Schinznach-Dorf / CH
03 / Wunder, Renate
St. Johanns-Vorstadt 74
CH-4056 Basel / CH
[1988/21]
Representative(s)Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1988/21]Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach
CH-8034 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date87114120.627.09.1987
[1988/21]
Priority number, dateCH1986000402308.10.1986         Original published format: CH 402386
[1988/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0268044
Date:25.05.1988
Language:DE
[1988/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0268044
Date:30.01.1991
Language:DE
[1991/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.1988
ClassificationInternational:G09F3/02
[1988/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1988/21]
TitleGerman:Verbundetikette zur Befestigung an einem Gegenstand[1988/21]
English:Compound label to be adhered to an object[1988/21]
French:Etiquette composée destinée à être fixée sur un objet[1988/21]
Examination procedure07.07.1988Examination requested  [1988/36]
28.06.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1990Fee for grant paid
04.10.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.10.1991  04.02.1992  ADMISSIBLE
schäfer-etiketten GmbH & Co.
Nürtinger Strasse 62
D-72649 Wolfschlugen / DE
Opponent's representative
Witte, Alexander
Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121
70178 Stuttgart / DE
 02  30.10.1991  04.02.1992  ADMISSIBLE
nilpeter a/s
Elmedalsvej 20
DK-4200 Slagelse / DK
Opponent's representative
Vingtoft, Knud Erik
Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DK
 [N/P]
Former [1992/05]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.1991  04.02.1992  ADMISSIBLE
schäfer-etiketten GmbH & Co.
Nürtinger Strasse 62
D-72649 Wolfschlugen / DE
Opponent's representative
Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing.
Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121
D-70178 Stuttgart / DE
 02  30.10.1991  04.02.1992  ADMISSIBLE
nilpeter a/s
Elmedalsvej 20
DK-4200 Slagelse / DK
Opponent's representative
Vingtoft, Knud Erik
Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S, Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007
DK-1021 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [1991/52]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.1991  04.02.1992  ADMISSIBLE
schäfer-etiketten GmbH & Co.
Nürtinger Strasse 62
D-72649 Wolfschlugen / DE
Opponent's representative
Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing.
Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121
D-70178 Stuttgart / DE
10.02.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.11.1996Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.11.1996Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE28.09.1996
[1997/39]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8604551  ;
 [AD]EP0157484  ;
 [A]CH225376  ;
 [A]DE2345675