Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0266565

EP0266565 - Chain tensioner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.1991
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG
Postfach 1220
91063 Herzogenaurach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/19]For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1-3 Postfach 1220
D-91063 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Goppelt, Dieter
Kärntnerstrasse 1
D-8521 Münchaurach / DE
02 / Schmidt, Dieter
Billrothstrasse 6
D-8500 Nürnberg / DE
[1988/19]
Representative(s)Klug, Horst
c/o INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Postfach 12 20
91063 Herzogenaurach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/19]Klug, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
c/o INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Postfach 12 20
D-91063 Herzogenaurach / DE
Application number, filing date87114459.803.10.1987
[1988/19]
Priority number, dateDE1986363691930.10.1986         Original published format: DE 3636919
[1988/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0266565
Date:11.05.1988
Language:DE
[1988/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0266565
Date:11.04.1990
Language:DE
[1990/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.1988
ClassificationInternational:F16H7/08
[1988/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1988/19]
TitleGerman:Kettenspanner[1988/19]
English:Chain tensioner[1988/19]
French:Tendeur de chaîne[1988/19]
Examination procedure03.10.1987Examination requested  [1988/19]
22.05.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.10.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.1989Fee for grant paid
23.12.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES22.07.1990
[2004/03]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE958070  ;
 [A]EP0106325  ;
 [AD]DE1650620