Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0270774

EP0270774 - Improved process of preparing polyol esters of rosin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  26.04.1996
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Union Camp Corporation
1600 Valley Road Wayne
New Jersey 07470 - 2066 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/24]For all designated states
Union Camp Corporation
1600 Valley Road
Wayne New Jersey 07470 - 2066 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Johnson, Robert W., Jr.
227 Groveland Circle
Savannah Georgia / US
[1988/24]
Representative(s)Boeters, Hans Dietrich , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/08]Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
D-81541 München / DE
Former [1988/24]Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr.
Patentanwälte Boeters Bauer Koepe Bereiteranger 15
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date87115024.914.10.1987
[1988/24]
Priority number, dateUS1986093155014.11.1986         Original published format: US 931550
[1988/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0270774
Date:15.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0270774
Date:31.07.1991
Language:EN
[1991/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.1988
ClassificationInternational:C09F1/04
[1988/24]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1988/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Zubereitung von Kolophoniumestern von mehrwertigen Alkoholen[1988/24]
English:Improved process of preparing polyol esters of rosin[1988/24]
French:Procédé pour préparer des esters de colophane et de polyol[1988/24]
Examination procedure15.12.1988Examination requested  [1989/07]
26.03.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.02.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.1991Fee for grant paid
08.04.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.03.1992  02.04.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1992/20]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.1992  02.04.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/08]
12.06.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.12.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.05.1993Date of oral proceedings
21.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
21.05.1993Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.07.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
26.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
27.12.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.01.1994Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.02.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
20.02.1994Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/29]
20.02.1994Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/24]
Appeal following opposition14.10.1994Appeal received No.  T0840/94
07.11.1994Statement of grounds filed
02.06.1995Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1995/22]
26.03.1996Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible
26.03.1996Date of oral proceedings
03.04.1996Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.198903   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.1990
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH31.10.1991
LI31.10.1991
BE31.10.1992
NL01.05.1993
ES15.10.1993
DE25.11.1993
[2004/38]
Former [2002/42]CH31.10.1991
LI31.10.1991
BE31.10.1992
NL01.05.1993
DE25.11.1993
Former [2002/14]CH31.07.1991
LI31.07.1991
BE31.10.1992
NL01.05.1993
DE25.11.1993
Former [1994/22]CH31.10.1991
LI31.10.1991
BE31.10.1992
NL01.05.1993
DE25.11.1993
Former [1993/38]CH31.10.1991
LI31.10.1991
BE31.10.1992
NL01.05.1993
Former [1992/33]CH31.10.1991
LI31.10.1991
Documents cited:Search[A]US3912709  (GOULD CHARLES WEBSTER);
 [A]US2331803  (SCHLAANSTINE RAYMOND F)
by applicantUS1696337
 US1697530
 US1734987
 US1893982
 US2327009
 US2369125
 US2409332
 US2420926
 US2434168
 US2440242
 US2536600
 US2572086
 US2590910
 US2736664
 US2864810
 US3780012