Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0270774 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0270774



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 286
25.04.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.04.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.04.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.04.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.03.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.03.1996 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
25.03.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.03.1996 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
29.02.1996 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
02.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.01.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.01.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
30.01.1996 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 2
26.01.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.01.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.01.1996 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 2
19.01.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
12.01.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.01.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.01.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.12.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
13.10.1995 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.10.1995 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
02.10.1995 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
02.06.1995 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
02.06.1995 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.11.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.11.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.11.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
03.11.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.11.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.11.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
31.10.1994 Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative Appeal 1
14.10.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.06.1994 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
03.06.1994 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
30.05.1994 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
24.03.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.02.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.02.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.02.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.02.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
10.02.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
10.02.1994 Means of redress Opposition 1
03.02.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.02.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.01.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.01.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.01.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.01.1994 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
24.01.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
24.01.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
24.01.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
24.01.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
24.01.1994 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.01.1994 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
24.01.1994 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.1994 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.1994 Means of redress Opposition 1
24.01.1994 Text intended for grant Opposition 7
21.01.1994 Withdrawal of application Opposition 1
05.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.01.1994 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.12.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.12.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.1993 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
26.10.1993 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
01.10.1993 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
05.08.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.07.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
28.07.1993 Claims Opposition 1
28.07.1993 Claims Opposition 1
28.07.1993 Claims Opposition 1
28.07.1993 Description Opposition 1
28.07.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.05.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
21.05.1993 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
21.05.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.05.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
02.04.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.03.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.03.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.03.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.03.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
19.03.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.03.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.03.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.03.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
02.03.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.1993 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.12.1992 Claims Opposition 2
18.12.1992 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
16.10.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.10.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.06.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.06.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.03.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.03.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.03.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.03.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
24.06.1991 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.05.1991 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.05.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
14.05.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.02.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
14.01.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.09.1990 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.09.1990 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
30.08.1990 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
26.07.1990 Claims Search / examination 2
26.07.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.06.1990 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.03.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.12.1989 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
21.06.1988 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.05.1988 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.04.1988 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.04.1988 European search report Search / examination 2
19.11.1987 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.11.1987 Priority document Search / examination 15
05.11.1987 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 2
26.10.1987 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
26.10.1987 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.10.1987 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.10.1987 Claims Search / examination 1
14.10.1987 Description Search / examination 8
14.10.1987 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.1987 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6