Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0270882

EP0270882 - In band connection establishment for a multiple multi-drop network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.1996
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/24]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Perry, Kenneth Jay
2901 Independence Avenue
Riverdale New York 10463 / US
02 / Thefain, Yannick Jean-Georges
336 Wolcott Avenue
Beacon New York 12508 / US
03 / Hailpern, Brent Tzion
26 The Terrace
Katonah New York 10536 / US
04 / Hoevel, Lee Windsor
9108 Woodstream Lane
Spring Valley Ohio 45370 / US
05 / Shea, Dennis Gerard
One Powder Horn Ridge
Danbury Connecticut 06811 / US
[1988/24]
Representative(s)Schäfer, Wolfgang
IBM Deutschland
Informationssysteme GmbH
Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/07]Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
D-70548 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1988/24]Herzog, Friedrich Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Birkenstrasse 77
D-71155 Altdorf / DE
Application number, filing date87116948.817.11.1987
[1988/24]
Priority number, dateUS1986094089112.12.1986         Original published format: US 940891
[1988/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0270882
Date:15.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0270882
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0270882
Date:14.02.1996
[1996/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.1990
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16
[1988/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1988/24]
TitleGerman:Verbindungsherstellung im Basisband für Vielfachmehrpunktnetzwerk[1988/24]
English:In band connection establishment for a multiple multi-drop network[1988/24]
French:Etablissement de connexions en bande de base pour réseau multipoint multiple[1988/24]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure22.10.1988Examination requested  [1988/51]
11.08.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.08.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.1995Fee for grant paid
14.11.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
15.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR14.02.1996
IT14.02.1996
DE15.05.1996
[2006/14]
Former [1999/42]IT14.02.1996
DE15.05.1996
FR12.07.1996
Former [1997/06]DE15.05.1996
FR12.07.1996
Former [1996/44]DE15.05.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60146550  ;
 [X]US4342083  (FREEDMAN MORRIS D, et al)
 [X]  IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 28, no. 12, May 1986, pages 5254-5258; "Non blocking circuit-switched local area network",
 [A]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 19, no. 310 (E-364)[2033], 6th December 1985; & JP-A-60 146 550,
ExaminationUS4485438