blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0238168

EP0238168 - Method and apparatus for moulding curved concrete sections [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.1993
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.1993 [1993/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE CIVILE DES BREVETS DE HENRI VIDAL
Tour Horizon Quai De Dion Bouton
F-92806 Puteaux Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]For all designated states
SOCIETE CIVILE DES BREVETS DE HENRI VIDAL
Tour Horizon Quai De Dion Bouton
F-92806 Puteaux Cedex / FR
Former [1987/39]For all designated states
Vidal, Henri
8 bis, Boulevard Maillot
F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Vidal, Henri
8 bis, Boulevard Maillot
F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
02 / Muelas-Medrano, Santiago
Vereda de Los Llanos, 1 La Moraleja
Alcobendas E-28109 Madrid / ES
[1987/39]
Representative(s)Piésold, Alexander James, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/52]Piesold, Alexander J., et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Former [1987/39]Holmes, Michael John
Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London, WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date87300493.121.01.1987
[1987/39]
Priority number, dateGB1986000141321.01.1986         Original published format: GB 8601413
[1987/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0238168
Date:23.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0238168
Date:09.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.1987
ClassificationIPC:B28B7/02
[1987/39]
CPC:
B28B7/025 (EP,US); B28B7/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Formen von gebogenen Sektionen aus Beton[1987/39]
English:Method and apparatus for moulding curved concrete sections[1987/39]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour mouler des sections courbes en béton[1987/39]
Examination procedure11.11.1987Examination requested  [1988/02]
11.08.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
25.05.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.03.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.1992Fee for grant paid
19.06.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.06.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35]
Request for further processing for:31.05.1991Request for further processing filed
31.05.1991Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.06.1991Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB478120  (JOHN CAMPBELL TOWNLEY);
 [AD]GB668372  (KWIKFORM LTD);
 [A]FR1212314  (ENTPR LEON CHAIZE & CIE);
 [A]GB847515  (ALWEG FORSCHUNG GMBH);
 [A]US3618886  (GRAHAM PHILLIP);
 [A]DE3125587  (HUENNEBECK GMBH [DE]);
 [A]DE3313347  (RUND STAHL BAU GMBH & CO [AT])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.