Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0234908

EP0234908 - Article of footwear [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.01.1996
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ahmad, Eddress
Box 1725 Avon
Colorado 81620 / US
For all designated states
Pack, Roger Nelson
Box 841 Edward
Colorado 81632 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/36]For all designated states
Ahmad, Eddress
Box 1725
Avon Colorado 81620 / US
For all designated states
Pack, Roger Nelson
Box 841
Edward Colorado 81632 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1987/36]
Representative(s)Lawrence, Malcolm Graham , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Ave
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]Lawrence, Malcolm Graham , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [1992/13]Bedggood, Guy Stuart , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Former [1990/16]Sommerville, John Henry , et al
SOMMERVILLE & RUSHTON 11 Holywell Hill
St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 1EZ / GB
Bedggood, Guy Stuart , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Former [1990/11]Sommerville, John Henry , et al
SOMMERVILLE & RUSHTON 11 Holywell Hill
St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 1EZ / GB
Former [1987/36]Bedggood, Guy Stuart
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date87301564.824.02.1987
[1987/36]
Priority number, dateUS1986083503828.02.1986         Original published format: US 835038
[1987/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0234908
Date:02.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0234908
Date:02.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.1989
ClassificationInternational:A43B5/04
[1987/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1987/45]
Former [1987/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schuhwerk[1987/36]
English:Article of footwear[1987/36]
French:Article chaussant[1987/36]
Examination procedure25.03.1987Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.05.1987Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GR, LU, NL
29.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/13]
04.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
14.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.1995Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/09]
29.09.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1996/09]
Appeal following examination04.02.1991Appeal received No.  J0004/91
10.04.1991Statement of grounds filed
22.10.1991Result of appeal procedure: allowance of appeal
20.06.1991Date of oral proceedings
01.07.1991Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
26.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.03.1987AT   M02   Not yet paid
24.03.1987ES   M02   Not yet paid
24.03.1987GR   M02   Not yet paid
24.03.1987LU   M02   Not yet paid
24.03.1987NL   M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.198903   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.1989
28.02.199105   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.1991
28.02.199307   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.1993
28.02.199509   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:SearchAT305086B  [ ];
 AT354307B  [ ];
 AT356541B  [ ];
 AT379731B  [ ];
 FR2351617  [ ];
 US4261114  [ ];
 EP0167765  [ ]