Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0234908 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0234908



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 334
04.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
08.01.1996 Closing of application Search / examination 2
29.09.1995 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
05.04.1995 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
07.03.1995 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.12.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
29.12.1994 Description Search / examination 4
29.12.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.12.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.12.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 8
13.10.1994 Brief communication with time limit Search / examination 1
27.07.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.07.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.06.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.02.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 33
19.07.1993 Annex Search / examination 3
19.07.1993 Claims Search / examination 5
19.07.1993 Description Search / examination 3
19.07.1993 Drawings Search / examination 1
19.07.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.07.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
19.05.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.05.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.05.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.04.1993 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
09.03.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.03.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.11.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.04.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.03.1992 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
26.03.1992 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.02.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
12.02.1992 Refund of fees Appeal 1
07.02.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
12.12.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.12.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.11.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.10.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 19
22.10.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
13.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.07.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.07.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.07.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.07.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.07.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.07.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.06.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.06.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.06.1991 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
25.05.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
25.05.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.05.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
15.05.1991 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
04.02.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.12.1990 Annex Appeal 1
06.12.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.12.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 7
22.05.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 5
24.04.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
24.04.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
16.02.1990 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
16.02.1990 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.02.1990 Annex Search / examination 1
09.02.1990 Annex Search / examination 1
09.02.1990 Annex Search / examination 1
09.02.1990 Annex Search / examination 1
09.02.1990 Annex Search / examination 2
09.02.1990 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
09.02.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.02.1990 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 7
30.01.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.01.1990 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
09.01.1990 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
09.01.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.09.1989 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
13.06.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.06.1989 European search report Search / examination 2
31.03.1989 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
01.09.1987 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
22.07.1987 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.05.1987 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) Search / examination 1
08.05.1987 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 2
28.04.1987 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
28.04.1987 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.04.1987 Invitation to pay designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
14.04.1987 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
14.04.1987 Priority document Search / examination 34
24.02.1987 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.02.1987 Claims Search / examination 4
24.02.1987 Description Search / examination 19
24.02.1987 Drawings Search / examination 5
24.02.1987 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6