Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0242035

EP0242035 - Disposable device for sharps [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.1993
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.07.1993 [1993/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NUFFIELD NURSING HOMES TRUST trading as NUFFIELD HOSPITALS
Nuffield House 1-2 The crescent Surbiton
Surrey KT6 4BN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/43]For all designated states
NUFFIELD NURSING HOMES TRUST trading as NUFFIELD HOSPITALS
Nuffield House 1-2 The crescent Surbiton
Surrey KT6 4BN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Redstone, June Margaret
91 Tennison Road
South Norwood London SE25 / GB
02 / Scott, Stephen Douglas
14 Langdale Crest Storth
Milnthorpe Cumbria LA7 7JG / GB
[1987/43]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/43]Rackham, Stephen Neil , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date87301839.403.03.1987
[1987/43]
Priority number, dateGB1986000899514.04.1986         Original published format: GB 8608995
[1987/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0242035
Date:21.10.1987
Language:EN
[1987/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0242035
Date:22.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.1987
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/06, A61B17/32
[1987/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1987/43]
TitleGerman:Wegwerfbehälter für scharfe medizinische Instrumente[1987/43]
English:Disposable device for sharps[1987/43]
French:Boîte jetable pour instrument médicaux tranchants[1987/43]
Examination procedure07.04.1988Examination requested  [1988/23]
08.04.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.01.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.1992Fee for grant paid
16.04.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.04.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4243140  (THRUN ROBERT H);
 [Y]EP0005052  (JERMED LTD [GB])