Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0244934

EP0244934 - Abrasive web and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.1993
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
401 North Lake Street Neenah
Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/43]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US
Former [1987/46]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
401, North Lake Street
Neenah Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lamers, Gregory C
705 South Fairview Street
Appleton Wisconsin 54914 / US
02 / Endres, Dan D
125 Crestview Drive
Appleton Wisconsin 54914 / US
03 / Hla Win, Maung
1071 Reed Street
Neenah Wisconsin 54956 / US
04 / Kuenn, Cary K
2029 West Marquette Street
Appleton Wisconsin 54914 / US
05 / Watts, Dr Hugo P
6 Orwell Close
Larkfield Maidstone Kent / GB
[1987/46]
Representative(s)Allen, Oliver John Richard , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/46]Allen, Oliver John Richard , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London, WC2R 0AE / GB
Application number, filing date87302174.513.03.1987
[1987/46]
Priority number, dateUS1986085917202.05.1986         Original published format: US 859172
[1987/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0244934
Date:11.11.1987
Language:EN
[1987/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0244934
Date:02.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.1989
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/56, A47L13/16, A47L17/08, A47L13/17, B32B5/08
[1989/44]
Former International [1987/46]D04H1/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/46]
TitleGerman:Schleifleinen und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben[1987/46]
English:Abrasive web and method of making same[1987/46]
French:Toile abrasive et son procédé de fabrication[1987/46]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure02.05.1990Examination requested  [1990/35]
04.12.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.12.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/23]
14.01.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1993/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
17.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XD]US3978185  (BUNTIN ROBERT R, et al);
 [A]US4041203  (BROCK ROBERT J, et al);
 [A]FR2070822  (FREUDENBERG CARL [DE]);
 [A]GB2004735  (IBING GMBH CO);
 [A]US4519798  (DINIUS RICHARD L [US])