Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0243061

EP0243061 - Off-line switcher with battery reserve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.1994
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.06.1994 [1994/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1987/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Eng, Wing Keung
60 Belton Street
Stanhope New Jersey 07821 / US
02 / Schroeder, Robert Edward
4 Ramar Street
Flanders New Jersey 07836 / US
[1987/44]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/04]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [1987/44]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk
AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date87303204.913.04.1987
[1987/44]
Priority number, dateUS1986085317317.04.1986         Original published format: US 853173
[1987/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0243061
Date:28.10.1987
Language:EN
[1987/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0243061
Date:02.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0243061
Date:30.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.1989
ClassificationInternational:H02J9/06
[1987/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1987/44]
TitleGerman:Netzabschalter mit Batteriereserve[1993/26]
English:Off-line switcher with battery reserve[1987/44]
French:Interrupteur autonome avec batterie de réserve[1987/44]
Former [1987/44]Off-lineschalter mit Reservebatterie
Examination procedure24.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/13]
09.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.1993Fee for grant paid
11.02.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
13.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US4564767  (CHARYCH ARTHUR [US]);
 [A]GB1559788  (POST OFFICE)