blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0247854

EP0247854 - Passive marker structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.1992
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.1993 [1993/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/49]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bolson, John H., Sr. c/o Minnesota Mining and
Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road
P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US
[1987/49]
Representative(s)Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/49]Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date87304696.527.05.1987
[1987/49]
Priority number, dateUS1986086878429.05.1986         Original published format: US 868784
[1987/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0247854
Date:02.12.1987
Language:EN
[1987/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0247854
Date:28.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0247854
Date:15.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1988
ClassificationIPC:G01V3/12
[1987/49]
CPC:
G01V15/00 (EP,US); H03J3/00 (KR); G01C15/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1987/49]
TitleGerman:Struktur einer passiven Marke[1987/49]
English:Passive marker structure[1987/49]
French:Construction d'une marque passive[1987/49]
Examination procedure22.06.1989Examination requested  [1989/33]
28.02.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.1991Fee for grant paid
19.07.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
18.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4334227  (MARKS BARRY M);
 [Y]US4110914  (RUDER NILS);
 [A]GB2063483  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]US3482370  (BRUECKMANN HELMUT)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.