blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0250219

EP0250219 - Method of storing photographic processing solution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.1995
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.03.1995 [1995/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/52]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Koboshi, Shigeharu
Konishiroku Photo Ind. Co., Ltd. 1-Sakura-machi
Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
02 / Miyaoka, Kazuyoshi
Konishiroku Photo Ind. Co., Ltd. 1-Sakura-machi
Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
03 / Kon, Masahiko
Konishiroku Photo Ind. Co., Ltd. 1-Sakura-machi
Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
[1987/52]
Representative(s)Wood, Anthony Charles, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street
London W1M 7PG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/30]Wood, Anthony Charles, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Former [1987/52]Burnside, Michael
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Application number, filing date87305361.517.06.1987
[1987/52]
Priority number, dateJP1986014281820.06.1986         Original published format: JP 14281886
JP1986014281920.06.1986         Original published format: JP 14281986
[1987/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0250219
Date:23.12.1987
Language:EN
[1987/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0250219
Date:12.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0250219
Date:30.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:G03C5/26
[1987/52]
CPC:
G03C5/264 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1987/52]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Speicherung einer photographischen Behandlungslösung[1987/52]
English:Method of storing photographic processing solution[1987/52]
French:Procédé de stockage d'une solution de traitement photographique[1987/52]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure29.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/39]
24.02.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.10.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.1993Fee for grant paid
14.12.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.12.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
09.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.02.1990M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1990
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE30.03.1994
[1995/03]
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP6173147  ;
 [A]JP6150144  ;
 [Y]US4588677  (ISHIKAWA TAKATOSHI [JP], et al);
 [Y]EP0151305  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]);
 [Y]US4252892  (CASE NELSON S);
 [Y]DE976605  (GEVAERT PHOTO PROD NV)
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 243 (P-489)[2299], 21st August 1986; & JP-A-61 73 147 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD) 15-04-1986, & JP6173147 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 210 (P-479)[2266], 23rd July 1986; & JP-A-61 50 144 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND. CO., LTD) 12-03-1986, & JP6150144 A 00000000
ExaminationUS4155763
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.