Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0254479

EP0254479 - Integrated circuit programmable sequencing element apparatus and associated method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.09.1992
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/04]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Agrawal, Om P.
3055 Rollingwood Ct.
San Jose California 95148 / US
02 / Khu, Arthur H.
3404 Chris Lane
San Mateo California 94403 / US
03 / Shankar, Kapil
247 N. Capitol Ave. No. 128-3
San Jose California 95127 / US
[1988/04]
Representative(s)Wright, Hugh Ronald , et al
Brookes Batchellor LLP
1 Boyne Park
Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/04]Wright, Hugh Ronald , et al
Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date87306268.115.07.1987
[1988/04]
Priority number, dateUS1986088945323.07.1986         Original published format: US 889453
[1988/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0254479
Date:27.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0254479
Date:29.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.1989
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/04
[1988/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/04]
TitleGerman:Gerät mit programmierbarem Sequenzelement in integrierter Schaltung und Verfahren dazu[1988/04]
English:Integrated circuit programmable sequencing element apparatus and associated method[1988/04]
French:Appareil avec élément séquencé programmable à circuit intégré et méthode associée[1988/04]
Examination procedure11.05.1989Examination requested  [1989/29]
21.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.09.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.01.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/44]
29.05.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1992/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4142246  ;
 [A]DE2846686
    [ ] - Research Disclosure no. 158, June 1977, VANT.HANTS (GB) page 20 - 21; R.E.Parker: "Sequential logic controllers"