Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0254568

EP0254568 - A semiconductor laser device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.1994
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.10.1994 [1994/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/04]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tokuda, Yasunori c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Chuo Kenkyusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi 8-chome
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Fujiwara, Kenzo c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Chuo Kenkyusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi 8-chome
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
03 / Tsukada, Noriaki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Chuo Kenkyusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi 8-chome
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
04 / Kojima, Keisuke c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Chuo Kenkyusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi 8-chome
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
05 / Nomura, Yoshinori c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Chuo Kenkyusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi 8-chome
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
06 / Matsui, Teruhito c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Chuo Kenkyusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi 8-chome
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
[1988/04]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/04]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date87306520.523.07.1987
[1988/04]
Priority number, dateJP1986017596525.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17596586
JP1986017596625.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17596686
JP1986017596725.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17596786
JP1986017596825.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17596886
JP1986017596925.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17596986
JP1986017597025.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17597086
JP1986017597125.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17597186
JP1986017597225.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17597286
JP1986017597325.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17597386
JP1986017597425.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17597486
JP1986017597525.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17597586
JP1986017628726.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17628786
[1988/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0254568
Date:27.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0254568
Date:20.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0254568
Date:13.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.1988
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/06, H01S3/103, H01S3/19, H01S3/23
[1993/41]
Former International [1988/04]H01S3/08, H01S3/103, H01S3/19, H01S3/23
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1988/04]
TitleGerman:Halbleiterlaservorrichtung[1988/04]
English:A semiconductor laser device[1988/04]
French:Dispositif laser à semi-conducteur[1988/04]
Examination procedure31.12.1988Examination requested  [1989/09]
21.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.03.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.1993Fee for grant paid
26.04.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP93200581.2  / EP0547038
EP93200587.9  / EP0547042
EP93200588.7  / EP0547043
EP93200589.5  / EP0547044
Opposition(s)14.07.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60128690  ;
 [A]JP59106171  ;
 [A]JP60016484  ;
 [Y]GB2114804  ;
 [A]GB2077484  ;
 [A]EP0187716  ;
 [A]WO8500472  ;
 [XP]EP0194335
 [Y]  - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 47, no. 8, 15th October 1985, pages 781-783, American Institute of Physics, Woodburry, New York, US; E.O. GÖBEL et al.: "Homogeneous gain saturation in GaAs/AlGaAs quantum well lasers"
 [AD]  - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 45, no. 1, 1st July 1984, pages 1-3, American Institute of Physics, Woodburry, New York, US; T. FUKUZAWA et al.: "GaAlAs buried multiquantum well lasers fabricated by diffusion-induced disordering"
 [AD]  - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 48, no. 1, 6th January 1986, pages 7-9, American Institute of Physics, Woodburry, New York, US; R.L. THORNTON et al.: "Highly efficient multiple emitter index guided array lasers fabricated by silicon impurity induced disordering"
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 288 (E-358)[2011], 15th November 1985; & JP-A-60 128 690 (FUJITSU K.K.) 09-07-1985, & JP60128690 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 226 (E-272)[1663], 17th October 1984; & JP-A-59 106 171 (FUJITSU K.K.) 19-06-1984, & JP59106171 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 131 (E-319)[1854], 6th June 1985; & JP-A-60 016 484 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN) 28-01-1985, & JP60016484 A 00000000
 [XP]  - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 49, no. 24, 15th December 1986, pages 1629-1631, American Institute of Physics, Woodburry, New York, US; Y. TOKUDA et al.: "Widely separate wavelength switching of single quantum well laser diode by injection-current control"