blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0257943

EP0257943 - Apparatus having a radially movable member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.1992
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITH INTERNATIONAL (NORTH SEA) LIMITED
Woodside Road Bridge of Don Aberdeen AB2 8EF
Scotland / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/09]For all designated states
SMITH INTERNATIONAL (NORTH SEA) LIMITED
Woodside Road Bridge of Don
Aberdeen AB2 8EF Scotland / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Springer, Johann
Plathnerstrasse 56
D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE
[1988/09]
Representative(s)Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al
Ladas & Parry
Altheimer Eck 2
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/17]Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al
Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Former [1988/09]Molyneaux, Martyn William
LANGNER PARRY 52-54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6RR / GB
Application number, filing date87307224.314.08.1987
[1988/09]
Priority number, dateGB1986002036321.08.1986         Original published format: GB 8620363
[1988/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0257943
Date:02.03.1988
Language:EN
[1988/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0257943
Date:08.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1989
ClassificationIPC:E21B10/32, E21B17/10, E21B31/20, E21B29/00, E21B23/06, E21B33/129, E21B23/00
[1988/09]
CPC:
E21B23/01 (EP,US); E21B10/32 (EP,US); E21B10/322 (EP,US);
E21B17/1014 (EP,US); E21B23/06 (EP,US); E21B29/005 (EP,US);
E21B31/20 (EP,US); E21B33/1291 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1988/09]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung mit einem radial bewegbaren Teil[1988/09]
English:Apparatus having a radially movable member[1988/09]
French:Dispositif ayant un élément déplaçable radialement[1988/09]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure02.04.1990Examination requested  [1990/22]
20.01.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.1992Application withdrawn by applicant  [1992/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2121634  (HUMASON GRANVILLE A);
 [X]US2427052  (JOHN GRANT);
 [AD]US2904114  (WEBB DERREL D, et al);
 [A]US2934147  (BAKER REUBEN C);
 [AD]US3019840  (KENNARD THOMAS A);
 [AD]GB916579  (BAKER OIL TOOLS INC);
 [X]US3105562  (STONE VIRGIL D, et al);
 [X]US3393742  (BIGELOW HERBERT L, et al);
 [X]US3542128  (OWEN ARTHUR L);
 [X]US3749167  (YOUNG D);
 [X]US4185704  (NIXON JEDDY D JR [US]);
 [A]GB2124275  (HUGHES TOOL CO);
 [X]US4693328  (FURSE JOHN H [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.