Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0261883

EP0261883 - Well cementing compositons [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.1993
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.12.1993 [1993/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON COMPANY
P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan
Oklahoma 73536 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/13]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON COMPANY
P.O. Drawer 1431
Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Brothers, Lance Everett
28 Quail Drive Route No. 1
Ninnekah Oklahoma 73036 / US
02 / Burkhalter, John Fred
1803 Parkview
Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US
[1988/13]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/13]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date87308273.918.09.1987
[1988/13]
Priority number, dateUS1986091275725.09.1986         Original published format: US 912757
[1988/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0261883
Date:30.03.1988
Language:EN
[1988/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0261883
Date:12.04.1989
Language:EN
[1989/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0261883
Date:09.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.1989
ClassificationInternational:E21B33/13, C04B28/04, C04B24/18
[1989/15]
Former International [1988/13]E21B33/13
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1988/13]
TitleGerman:Bohrloch-Zementierungszusammensetzungen[1988/13]
English:Well cementing compositons[1988/13]
French:Compositions de cimentation pour puits de forage[1988/13]
Examination procedure12.06.1989Examination requested  [1989/32]
24.09.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.03.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.03.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.1992Fee for grant paid
05.06.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.09.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4482383  (MCKENZIE LEE F [US]);
 [X]US4482381  (SPITZ RODNEY D [US], et al);
 [Y]US3878895  (WIELAND DENTON R, et al);
 [Y]US4413681  (MCKENZIE LEE F [US])