blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0274200

EP0274200 - Polyolefins stabilized against oxidative degradation with mixtures of aralkyl-substituted diarylamines and sterically hindered phosphites [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.1994
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.01.1995 [1995/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIROYAL CHEMICAL COMPANY, Inc.
World Headquarters Middlebury
Connecticut 06749 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/28]For all designated states
UNIROYAL CHEMICAL COMPANY, Inc.
World Headquarters
Middlebury Connecticut 06749 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chucta, Thomas Max
151 Andrew Avenue, Apt. 148
Naugatuck, CT 06770 / US
[1994/05]
Former [1988/28]01 / Chucta, Thomas Max
151 Andrew Avenue Apartment 148
Naugatuck Connecticut 06770 / US
Representative(s)Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds
LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/44]Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr., et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB
Former [1988/28]Harrison, Michael Robert
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 5th Floor Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds, LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date87310151.318.11.1987
[1988/28]
Priority number, dateUS1986094165711.12.1986         Original published format: US 941657
[1988/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0274200
Date:13.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0274200
Date:02.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0274200
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1990
ClassificationIPC:C08K5/00, C08L23/02, // (C08K5/00, 5:18, 5:52)
[1988/28]
CPC:
C08K5/18 (EP); C08K5/00 (KR); C08K5/17 (KR);
C08K5/524 (EP)
C-Set:
C08K5/18, C08L23/02 (EP);
C08K5/524, C08L23/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/28]
TitleGerman:Durch Mischungen von aralkylsubstituierten Diarylaminen und sterisch gehinderten Phosphiten gegen oxidativen Abbau stabilisierte Polyolefine[1988/28]
English:Polyolefins stabilized against oxidative degradation with mixtures of aralkyl-substituted diarylamines and sterically hindered phosphites[1988/28]
French:Polyoléfines stabilisées contre la dégradation oxydative avec des mélanges de diarylamines aralkylées et de phénols stériquement encombrés[1988/28]
Examination procedure29.10.1990Examination requested  [1990/52]
08.02.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.04.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.1993Fee for grant paid
25.06.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP59098148  ;
 [AD]US4290941  (ZINKE HORST, et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 212 (C-244)[1649], 27th September 1984; & JP-A-59 098 148 (HITACHI DENSEN K.K.) 06-06-1984, & JP59098148 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.