Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0273588

EP0273588 - Sulphurised alkaline earth metal hydrocarbyl phenates, their production and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED
Dock Road South, Bromborough Wirral
Merseyside L62 4SH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/50]For all designated states
LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED
Dock Road South, Bromborough
Wirral, Merseyside L62 4SH / GB
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED
BP House, Breakspear Way
Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire HP2 4UL / GB
Former [1988/27]For all designated states
BP CHEMICALS (ADDITIVES) LIMITED
Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road
London SW1W 0SU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Cane, Charles
BP Chemicals Limited Salt End
Hull, HU12 8DS / GB
02 / Crawford, John
BP Chemicals (Additives) Limited 36/44 High Street
Redhill Surrey RH1 1RW / GB
03 / O'Connor, Sean Patrick
BP Chemicals Limited Salt End
Hull, HU12 8DS / GB
[1988/27]
Representative(s)Crisp, David Norman , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Crisp, David Norman , et al
D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [1988/27]Richardson, Derek , et al
BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
Application number, filing date87310461.626.11.1987
[1988/27]
Priority number, dateGB1986002860929.11.1986         Original published format: GB 8628609
[1988/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0273588
Date:06.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0273588
Date:12.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/33]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0273588
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.1988
ClassificationInternational:C10M159/22
[1988/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1988/27]
TitleGerman:Geschwefelt Erdalkalimetallalkylphenolate, ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung[1988/27]
English:Sulphurised alkaline earth metal hydrocarbyl phenates, their production and use thereof[1988/27]
French:Alkylphénates de métaux alcalino-terreux sulfurés, leur préparation et leur utilisation[1988/27]
Examination procedure08.07.1988Examination requested  [1988/40]
31.03.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
11.01.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.02.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.01.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
07.02.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.1992Fee for grant paid
12.03.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.05.1993  21.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Exxon Chemical Patents Inc.
1900 East Linden Avenue
Linden, New Jersey 07036 / US
Opponent's representative
Uexküll & Stolberg, et al
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1993/27]
Opponent(s)01  12.05.1993  21.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Exxon Chemical Patents Inc.
1900 East Linden Avenue
Linden, New Jersey 07036 / US
Opponent's representative
UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
25.06.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.12.1993Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.03.1995Date of oral proceedings
29.03.1995Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.03.1995Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.07.2000Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.11.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
26.01.2001Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition24.05.1995Appeal received No.  T0450/95
27.07.1995Statement of grounds filed
29.09.2000Interlocutory revision of appeal
29.09.2000Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
18.07.2000Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2000Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:14.02.1990Request for further processing filed
14.02.1990Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.03.1990Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.11.1999
SE27.11.1999
CH30.11.1999
ES30.11.1999
GR30.11.1999
LI30.11.1999
[2009/30]
Former [2004/09]AT26.11.1999
SE27.11.1999
CH30.11.1999
GR30.11.1999
LI30.11.1999
Former [2001/09]AT26.11.1999
SE27.11.1999
CH30.11.1999
LI30.11.1999
Former [2001/08]AT26.11.1999
CH30.11.1999
LI30.11.1999
Former [2000/52]CH30.11.1999
LI30.11.1999
Former [2000/50]CH17.06.2000
LI17.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0095322  (OROBIS LTD [GB]);
 [X]US4328111  (WATSON ROGER W, et al)