blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0272024

EP0272024 - Methods for the production of shell-like mouldings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.1991
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Verta Miles Limited
Unit 2 Corbett Industrial Estate Corbett Street
Manchester M11 4BD / GB
[1988/25]
Inventor(s)01 / James, David
33 Lever Street
Radcliffe Manchester / GB
[1988/25]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John Gordon, et al
Lloyd Wise, McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane
Stockport, Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/25]Lawrence, John Gordon, et al
McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane
Stockport, Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB
Application number, filing date87310679.304.12.1987
[1988/25]
Priority number, dateGB1986003038519.12.1986         Original published format: GB 8630385
[1988/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0272024
Date:22.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0272024
Date:19.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:B29C51/28, B30B5/02
[1989/26]
CPC:
B29C51/28 (EP); B29C43/12 (EP); B29L2009/00 (EP);
B29L2031/726 (EP)
Former IPC [1988/25]B29C51/14, B29C51/04, B29C67/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen von schalenförmigen Formgegenständen[1988/25]
English:Methods for the production of shell-like mouldings[1988/25]
French:Procédé de production d'articles moulés en forme de coquille[1988/25]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure05.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/15]
15.04.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.1991Application withdrawn by applicant  [1991/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3017258  ;
 [X]FR2217961  ;
 [X]GB988370  ;
 [XP]EP0234473  ;
 [A]FR2325483  ;
 [A]DE2511811  ;
 [A]DE2544664  ;
 [A]US2838796
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.