blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0272042

EP0272042 - Storage container for a recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1988/25]Storage container for a recording medium and methods for manufacturing and assembling same
[1992/27]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.1994
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHAPE INC.
Biddeford Industrial Park P.O. Box 366 Biddeford
Maine 04005 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/25]For all designated states
SHAPE INC.
Biddeford Industrial Park P.O. Box 366
Biddeford Maine 04005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gelardi, Anthony L.
P.O. Box 213
Cape Porpoise Maine 04014 / US
02 / Gelardi, John
P.O. Box 213
Cape Porpoise Maine 04014 / US
03 / Rolfe, Richard
95 Graham Street
Biddeford Maine 04005 / US
04 / Lowry, Alan B.
274 Washington Street
Canton Massachusetts 02021 / US
05 / Lovecky, Craig
62 Washington Avenue
Old Orchard Beach Maine 04064 / US
[1988/25]
Representative(s)McCall, John Douglas, et al
WP Thompson
Coopers Building
Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]McCall, John Douglas, et al
W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [1988/25]McCall, John Douglas, et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date87310814.609.12.1987
[1988/25]
Priority number, dateUS1986094226616.12.1986         Original published format: US 942266
[1988/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0272042
Date:22.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0272042
Date:12.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0272042
Date:18.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:G11B33/04
[1988/25]
CPC:
G11B33/0427 (EP,US); Y10S493/946 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/25]
TitleGerman:Lagerungsbehälter für Aufzeichnungsträger[1992/27]
English:Storage container for a recording medium[1992/27]
French:Boîte de rangement pour support d'enregistrement[1992/27]
Former [1988/25]Lagerungsbehälter für Aufzeichnungsträger und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Montage
Former [1988/25]Storage container for a recording medium and methods for manufacturing and assembling same
Former [1988/25]Boîte de rangement pour support d'enregistrement et méthode de fabrication et d'assemblage de cette boîte
Examination procedure02.12.1989Examination requested  [1990/04]
26.03.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.11.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.11.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.1993Fee for grant paid
16.04.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.01.199003   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.1990
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.08.1993
BE18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
IT18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
NL18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
ES29.11.1993
LU31.12.1993
[2004/03]
Former [2000/06]AT18.08.1993
BE18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
IT18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
NL18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
LU31.12.1993
Former [1999/42]AT18.08.1993
BE18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
IT18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
NL18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/32]AT18.08.1993
BE18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
NL18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/25]AT18.08.1993
BE18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
DE18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
NL18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/22]AT18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
DE18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/19]AT18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/16]CH18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/05]CH18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
Documents cited:Search[XD]GB2091219  (EGLY ROBERT A);
 [XD]US4478335  (LONG JERRY M [US], et al);
 [XD]EP0130266  (STADELMANN ERNST GMBH [AT]);
 [XD]WO8501033  (INNOVATIVE CONCEPTS INC [US]);
 [AD]US4511034  (PAN YOU-CHWEN [TW]);
 [X]DE3414903  (BURGSCHWEIGER OTTO);
 [A]WO8607182  (EMPAK INC [US]);
 [XP]EP0221749  (SONY CORP [JP]);
 [AP]US4702369  (PHILOSOPHE ISIDORE [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.