blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0271340

EP0271340 - Oximeter apparatus and method for measuring arterial blood constituents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.1996
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yelderman, Mark
P.O. Box 872065
Dallas, Texas 75287 / US
[1996/18]
Former [1988/24]For all designated states
Yelderman, Mark
736 LaMesa
Menlo Park California / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1988/24]
Representative(s)Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/24]Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date87310869.010.12.1987
[1988/24]
Priority number, dateUS1986094086012.12.1986         Original published format: US 940860
US1986094649224.12.1986         Original published format: US 946492
[1988/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0271340
Date:15.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0271340
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.1988
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/00, A61B5/14
[1996/06]
CPC:
A61B5/14551 (EP); A61B6/00 (KR)
Former IPC [1988/24]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/24]
TitleGerman:Messgerät und Verfahren zum Messen der arteriellen Blutsauerstoffsättigung[1988/24]
English:Oximeter apparatus and method for measuring arterial blood constituents[1988/24]
French:Oxymètre et méthode pour mesurer les constituants du sang artériel[1988/24]
Examination procedure15.12.1988Examination requested  [1989/06]
18.05.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.1990Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
19.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
29.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
06.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.1995Date of oral proceedings
01.03.1995Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.03.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.1995Fee for grant paid
12.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination03.04.1990Appeal received No.  T0557/90
15.06.1990Statement of grounds filed
13.01.1993Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Opposition(s)08.11.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
16.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
29.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3463142  (HARTE RICHARD A);
 [A]DE2136823  (HELLIGE & CO GMBH F);
 [A]US4555179  (LANGERHOLC JOHN [DE], et al);
 [A]WO8600514  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]);
 [Y]EP0160768
 [Y]  - MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 10, no. 1, January 1972, pages 9-22, Pergamon Press, GB; F.J. JANSSEN: "The principle design and features of a new Hb-oximeter"
ExaminationUS4167331
 EP0102816
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.