Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0275663

EP0275663 - Optical signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1988/30]Optical signal processing device
[1994/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.1995
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2009/47]
Former [1993/28]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
British Telecom Centre, 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Former [1988/30]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
British Telecom Centre, 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Adams, Michael John
12 Beverley Court Christchurch Street
Ipswich Suffolk IP4 2DH / GB
[1988/30]
Representative(s)Dutton, Erica L. G. , et al
BT Group Legal Services
Intellectual Property Department
8th Floor, Holborn Centre
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/46]Dutton, Erica L. G. , et al
British Telecom Intellectual Property Department 151 Gower Street
London WC1E 6BA / GB
Former [1988/30]Roberts, Simon Christopher
BRITISH TELECOM Intellectual Property Unit 13th Floor 151, Gower Street
London, WC1E 6BA / GB
Application number, filing date87310985.414.12.1987
[1988/30]
Priority number, dateGB1986002987315.12.1986         Original published format: GB 8629873
[1988/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0275663
Date:27.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0275663
Date:06.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.1988
ClassificationInternational:G02F3/00, H01S3/23
[1988/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/30]
TitleGerman:Optische Signalverarbeitung[1994/14]
English:Optical signal processing[1994/14]
French:Traitement d'un signal optique[1994/14]
Former [1988/30]Bauelement für optische Signalverarbeitung
Former [1988/30]Optical signal processing device
Former [1988/30]Dispositif de traitement d'un signal optique
Examination procedure23.01.1989Examination requested  [1989/13]
21.05.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.12.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.10.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.1994Fee for grant paid
05.01.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13]
Request for further processing for:08.12.1992Request for further processing filed
08.12.1992Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.03.1993Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.04.1994
BE06.04.1994
CH06.04.1994
GR06.04.1994
LI06.04.1994
NL06.04.1994
SE06.04.1994
ES17.07.1994
LU31.12.1994
[2004/03]
Former [2002/23]AT06.04.1994
BE06.04.1994
CH06.04.1994
GR06.04.1994
LI06.04.1994
NL06.04.1994
SE06.04.1994
LU31.12.1994
Former [2000/04]AT06.04.1994
BE06.04.1994
CH06.04.1994
GR06.04.1994
LI06.04.1994
NL06.04.1994
LU31.12.1994
Former [1995/12]AT06.04.1994
BE06.04.1994
CH06.04.1994
LI06.04.1994
NL06.04.1994
Former [1995/11]AT06.04.1994
BE06.04.1994
CH06.04.1994
LI06.04.1994
Former [1995/02]AT06.04.1994
CH06.04.1994
LI06.04.1994
Former [1994/48]CH06.04.1994
LI06.04.1994
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0193819  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]FR2414739  (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]);
 [A]US3724926  (LEE T);
 [A]EP0169567  (NEC CORP [JP])
 [A]  - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. QE-19, no. 11, November 1983, pages 1621-1625, IEEE, New York, US; W.T. TSANG et al.: "Optoelectronic logic operations by cleaved-coupled-cavity semiconductor lasers"
 [A]  - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 48, no. 5, 3rd February 1986, pages 321-322, American Institute of Physics, Woodbury, New York, US; W.F. SHARFIN et al.: "Femtojoule optical switching in nonlinear semiconductor laser amplifiers"
Examination   - OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 24, no. 4, July/August 1985; C.T.SEATON et al.: "Nonlinear guided wave applications", pages 593-599
    - OPTICAL AND QUANTUM ELECTRONICS 19, 1987, pages S37-S45; M.J.ADAMS: "Optical amplifier bistability on reflection"