blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0234965

EP0234965 - Device for testing the surface condition of materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.1991
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Antoine, Antoine
F-08370 La Ferté sur Chiers / FR
[1987/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1987/36]
Representative(s)Gérardin, Robert Jean René
PROT'INNOV INTERNATIONAL SA
Résidence de l'Observatoire
3A, avenue Georges Clémenceau
BP 2764
51066 Reims Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/36]Gérardin, Robert Jean René
PROT'INNOV INTERNATIONAL SA Résidence de l'Observatoire avenue Georges Clémenceau Boîte Postale 2764
F-51066 Reims Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date87400042.512.01.1987
[1987/36]
Priority number, dateFR1986000047013.01.1986         Original published format: FR 8600470
[1987/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0234965
Date:02.09.1987
Language:FR
[1987/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0234965
Date:18.07.1990
Language:FR
[1990/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.1987
ClassificationIPC:G01B5/28, G01N19/02
[1987/36]
CPC:
G01N13/00 (EP,US); G01B5/28 (EP,US); G01N19/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/36]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung der Oberflächenbeschaffenheit von Materialien[1987/36]
English:Device for testing the surface condition of materials[1987/36]
French:Dispositif de contrôle de l'état de surface de matériaux[1987/36]
Examination procedure09.12.1987Examination requested  [1988/05]
12.04.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.01.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.1990Fee for grant paid
23.03.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.07.1990
IT18.07.1990
NL18.07.1990
SE18.07.1990
ES29.10.1990
BE31.01.1991
[2004/03]
Former [1999/42]AT18.07.1990
IT18.07.1990
NL18.07.1990
SE18.07.1990
BE31.01.1991
Former [1992/18]AT18.07.1990
NL18.07.1990
SE18.07.1990
BE31.01.1991
Former [1991/33]AT18.07.1990
NL18.07.1990
SE18.07.1990
Former [1991/29]AT18.07.1990
SE18.07.1990
Former [1991/16]SE18.07.1990
Documents cited:Search[A]US3017618  (CROSS ANTHONY S);
 [A]FR1460033  (GRP DE RECH S DE IND DU FROTTE, et al);
 [A]US3935468  (BOWEN HOWARD, et al);
 [A]DE2627239  (MASSON SCOTT THRISSELL ENG LTD);
 [X]DE2535912  (SALJE ERNST);
 [A]US4051713  (BAO FRANK W, et al);
 [A]DE2947529  (SIEMENS AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.