blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0236156

EP0236156 - Composting process, microbial inoculum comprising, as a carrier, dried ground grape pulp and application, more particularly, to enrichment of soils [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.1990
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE DE PRODUCTION ET COMMERCIALISATION DES ENGRAIS ET PHYTOS
25, avenue de Bordeaux
F-11100 Narbonne / FR
[1987/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Thierry, Alain
Residence La Patinoire Avenue de Vert Bois
F-34100 Montpellier / FR
02 / Chicheportiche, Robert
"Les Gours" Lot No 5 Route de Laverune
F-34100 Montpellier / FR
 [2007/32]
Former [1987/37]01 / Thierry, Alain
Residence La Patinoire Avenue de Vert Bois
F-34100 Montpellier / FR
02 / Chicheportiche, Robert
"Les Gours" Lot No 5 Route de Laverune
F-34100 Montpellier / FR
Representative(s)Warcoin, Jacques, et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]Warcoin, Jacques, et al
Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date87400095.316.01.1987
[1987/37]
Priority number, dateFR1986000062617.01.1986         Original published format: FR 8600626
FR1986000062717.01.1986         Original published format: FR 8600627
[1987/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0236156
Date:09.09.1987
Language:FR
[1987/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0236156
Date:09.12.1987
Language:FR
[1987/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.1987
ClassificationIPC:C05F9/04, C05F11/08, C12N11/02, C12N1/04, // C12F3/06
[1987/37]
CPC:
C05F17/00 (EP); C05F11/08 (EP); C05F17/20 (EP);
C05F9/04 (EP); C12N11/02 (EP); Y02A40/20 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP); Y02W30/40 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kompostierung, mikrobiologisches Inoculum, das als Träger getrocknete und zerstossene Traubenpulpe enthält, sowie dessen Anwendung, besonders zur Anreicherung von Böden[1987/37]
English:Composting process, microbial inoculum comprising, as a carrier, dried ground grape pulp and application, more particularly, to enrichment of soils[1987/37]
French:Nouveau procédé de compostage, inoculum microbien comportant comme support, de la pulpe de raisin sechée et broyée et application, notamment, à l'enrichissement des sols[1987/37]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
File destroyed:27.06.1996
Examination procedure25.01.1988Examination requested  [1988/13]
01.08.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/10]
01.09.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1990/10]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.198903   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchAT341551B  [ ] (WIENER BRUECKENBAU [AT]);
 FR2341538  [ ] (JUNG ALFONS [DE]);
 EP0090754  [ ] (AGRI ALS SOC ALSACIENNE APPLIC [FR], et al);
 FR2357506  [ ] (GRAEFE GERNOT [AT]);
 FR2142883  [ ] (BONNET JEAN);
 FR2509748  [ ] (SANTERRE ORSAN [FR]);
 EP0120369  [ ] (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]);
 FR2370566  [ ] (SACY GEORGES [FR]);
 FR2559478  [ ] (HARROP JOHN [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.