blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0236181

EP0236181 - Generator of a sawtooth voltage signal and apparatus for regulating the temperature in the interior of a vehicle comprising this generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.06.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO
64, avenue de la Grande Armée
75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]For all designated states
VALEO
64, avenue de la Grande Armée
F-75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Brenier, Henri
8 bis, avenue Voltaire
F-78600 Maisons Laffitte / FR
[1987/37]
Representative(s)Netter, André, et al
Cabinet NETTER, 40, rue Vignon
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]Netter, André, et al
Cabinet NETTER, 40, rue Vignon
F-75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date87400190.228.01.1987
[1987/37]
Priority number, dateFR1986000152004.02.1986         Original published format: FR 8601520
[1987/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0236181
Date:09.09.1987
Language:FR
[1987/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.1987
ClassificationIPC:H03K4/00, H03K4/50
[1987/37]
CPC:
H03K4/501 (EP); H03K4/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [1987/37]
TitleGerman:Generator eines Sägezahn-Spannungssignals und diesen Generator enthaltende Temperaturregelvorrichtung für den Innenraum eines Fahrzeuges[1987/37]
English:Generator of a sawtooth voltage signal and apparatus for regulating the temperature in the interior of a vehicle comprising this generator[1987/37]
French:Générateur d'un signal de tension en dents de scie, et dispositif de régulation de la température dans un habitacle de véhicule, comprenant ce générateur[1987/37]
File destroyed:27.06.1996
Examination procedure28.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/48]
26.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/33]
08.03.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1990/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2447655  ;
 [Y]DE1229140  ;
 [A]FR2423811  ;
 [A]DE3307220
 [A]  - ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, vol. 53, no. 16, 17 juillet 1980, pages 123,125, New York, US; R.K. KIRSCHMAN: "Adjustable ex generator colors synthesizer's sounds"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.