Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE54206T | 15.07.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR8605948 | 24.04.1986 | EP87400791 | 08.04.1987 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0247909 | ![]() | 27.06.1990 | B1 | EP0247909 | 02.12.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8605948 | 24.04.1986 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3763458D1 | 02.08.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8605948 | 24.04.1986 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2597971 | 19.10.1990 | B1 | FR2597971 | 30.10.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8605948 | 24.04.1986 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS62260108 | 12.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8605948 | 24.04.1986 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4770047 | 13.09.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8605948 | 24.04.1986 |