blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0246153

EP0246153 - Improved feeder for electrical component supply tapes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.12.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSAL INSTRUMENTS CORPORATION (Delaware Corp.)
P.O. Box 825 Binghamton
New York 13902-0825 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/47]For all designated states
UNIVERSAL INSTRUMENTS CORPORATION (Delaware Corp.)
P.O. Box 825
Binghamton New York 13902-0825 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hamilton, Daniel L.
7513 Springmeadow
Garland Texas 75042 / US
02 / Spowart, James R.
1325 Parker Road
Wylie Texas 75098 / US
03 / Porterfield, Richard
Post Office Box 79
Chenango Bridge New York 13 745 / US
[1987/47]
Representative(s)Rodhain, Claude, et al
Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/47]Rodhain, Claude, et al
Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey
F-75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date87401065.512.05.1987
[1987/47]
Priority number, dateUS1986086197712.05.1986         Original published format: US 861977
[1987/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0246153
Date:19.11.1987
Language:EN
[1987/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0246153
Date:21.03.1990
Language:EN
[1990/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1990
ClassificationIPC:H05K13/00, H05K13/04
[1987/47]
CPC:
H05K13/0038 (EP,US); H05K13/0417 (US); H05K13/0419 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1987/47]
TitleGerman:Zuführvorrichtung für Gurte zum Versorgen von elektrischen Bauelementen[1987/47]
English:Improved feeder for electrical component supply tapes[1987/47]
French:Dispositif d'amenée pour bandes d'alimentation de composants électriques[1987/47]
File destroyed:01.02.1999
Examination procedure18.07.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1991/07]
22.09.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.10.1990M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0013979  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0071302  (PHILIPS NV [NL]);
 [A]US4440355  (MORI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.