blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0251945

EP0251945 - Procedure for closing packing containers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1988/01]Automatic closing device suitable for all types of packing containers
[1991/18]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  08.08.1997
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Justamente, Raphaelle
113, chemin du figuier Bt Dombes
F-01700 MIRIBEL / FR
[1988/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1988/01]
Representative(s)Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/03]Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al
Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 142-150 cours Lafayette - BP 3058
F-69392 LYON CEDEX 03 / FR
Former [1988/43]Karmin, Roger
Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 142-150 cours Lafayette BP 3058
F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR
Application number, filing date87420170.019.06.1987
[1988/01]
Priority number, dateFR1986000941225.06.1986         Original published format: FR 8609412
[1988/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0251945
Date:07.01.1988
Language:FR
[1988/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0251945
Date:02.05.1991
Language:FR
[1991/18]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0251945
Date:24.09.1997
Language:FR
[1997/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1987
ClassificationIPC:B65D5/14, B65D5/12, B65D85/16
[1988/01]
CPC:
B65D5/14 (EP); B65D85/07 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verschliessen von Verpackungsbehältern[1991/18]
English:Procedure for closing packing containers[1991/18]
French:Procédé de fermeture automatique destiné aux emballages conteneurs[1991/18]
Former [1988/01]Automatisches Verschlusssystem für alle Verpackungsbehälter
Former [1988/01]Automatic closing device suitable for all types of packing containers
Former [1988/01]Système particulier de fermeture automatique destiné à tous les emballages conteneurs
Examination procedure27.05.1988Examination requested  [1988/32]
02.11.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.11.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.1991Fee for grant paid
26.01.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.01.1992  18.02.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Transordures
BP 17 - 3 rue de la Riviere
78420 Carrieres Sur Seine / FR
Opponent's representative
Santarelli, Marc
Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée
75017 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [1992/13]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.1992  18.02.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Transordures
BP 17 - 3 rue de la Riviere
78420 Carrieres Sur Seine / FR
Opponent's representative
Santarelli, Marc
Cabinet Rinuy et Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée
F-75017 Paris / FR
04.03.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.06.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.07.1992Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
25.09.1992Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
23.06.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.10.1994Date of oral proceedings
08.12.1994Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.02.1997Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.02.1997Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.07.1997Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
25.07.1997Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition30.01.1995Appeal received No.  T0136/95
14.04.1995Statement of grounds filed
18.10.1995Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1995/42]
25.02.1997Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
25.02.1997Date of oral proceedings
12.03.1997Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.1991
GR02.05.1991
SE02.05.1991
[2000/04]
Former [1992/03]AT02.05.1991
SE02.05.1991
Former [1991/51]SE02.05.1991
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR1579675  ;
 [Y]WO8101398  (SWAN W [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.