blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0235094

EP0235094 - Coupling device for carriages, particularly carriages for transport systems for industrial plants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.09.1988
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIANELLI & TRAVERSA S.a.s.
Corso IV Novembre 53
10090 Cascine Vica (Torino) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1987/36]For all designated states
PIANELLI & TRAVERSA S.a.s.
Corso IV Novembre 53
I-10090 Cascine Vica Torino / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Grande, Dario
Corso Trapani 183
I-10141 Torino / IT
[1987/36]
Representative(s)Bosotti, Luciano, et al
C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A.
Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1987/36]Bosotti, Luciano, et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
I-10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date87830028.423.01.1987
[1987/36]
Priority number, dateIT1986006714525.02.1986         Original published format: IT 6714586
[1987/36]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0235094
Date:02.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.1987
ClassificationIPC:B60D1/10, B60B33/02
[1987/36]
CPC:
B60D1/26 (EP); B60B33/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   LI,   SE [1987/36]
TitleGerman:Kupplung für Transportwagen, insbesondere Transportwagen für industrielle Anlagen[1987/36]
English:Coupling device for carriages, particularly carriages for transport systems for industrial plants[1987/36]
French:Couplage pour chariots, en particulier chariots pour des systèmes de transport pour équipements industriels[1987/36]
File destroyed:29.08.1994
Examination procedure03.03.1988Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/42]
27.05.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1988/42]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB338460  (ARTHUR ADE);
 [A]US2494696  (FORBES CHARLES F);
 [X]US2844390  (SMITH LEONARD L);
 [X]US3889979  (SCHMIESING GREGORY E);
 [X]US3912302  (PATTERSON ETHREDGE T);
 [A]FR2292596  (TENTE ROLLEN GMBH & CO [DE]);
 [A]US4391562  (HETZNER RANDALL H [US])
 [A]  - N.P. CHIRONIS: "Mechanisms, linkages and mechanical controls", 1965, pages 80,81, McGraw-Hill, New YorkUS; "10 ways to change straight-line direction"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.