Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0255489

EP0255489 - Nonvolatile, semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.1994
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.1994 [1994/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Srl
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1989/45]For all designated states
SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l.
Via C. Olivetti, 2
I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
Former [1988/05]For all designated states
SGS MICROELETTRONICA S.p.A.
Stradale Primosole 50
I-95121 Catania / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Baldi, Livio
Via Dante, 26/28
I-20041 Agrate Brianza / IT
[1988/05]
Representative(s)Pellegri, Alberto , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1988/05]Pellegri, Alberto , et al
c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Puccini, 7
I-21100 Varese / IT
Application number, filing date87830234.822.06.1987
[1988/05]
Priority number, dateIT1986008363010.07.1986         Original published format: IT 8363086
[1988/05]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0255489
Date:03.02.1988
Language:EN
[1988/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0255489
Date:06.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0255489
Date:21.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.1988
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/788, G11C17/00
[1993/16]
Former International [1988/05]H01L29/78, G11C17/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1988/05]
TitleGerman:Nichtflüchtige Halbleiterspeicheranordnung[1988/05]
English:Nonvolatile, semiconductor memory device[1988/05]
French:Mémoire non volatile à semi-conducteur[1988/05]
Examination procedure08.11.1988Examination requested  [1989/04]
27.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.09.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.1992Fee for grant paid
03.10.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.01.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US3728695  ;
 [X]US4532535  ;
 [X]GB2011168  ;
 [X]FR2295523  ;
 [A]EP0100572
 [X]  - THE TRANSACTIONS OF THE IECE OF JAPAN, vol. E-59, no. 8, August 1976, page 31; T. WADA: "Charge storage characteristics of MIS-FETs with floating gate"
 [X]  - NACHRICHTEN TECHNIK ELEKTRONIK, vol. 22, no. 10, 1972, pages 366-367; E. KÖHLER: "Der Floating-Gate-Transistor - eine neue elektrisch programmierbare Speicherzelle"