Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0247983

EP0247983 - New pharmaceutical preparation for oral use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  12.01.1996
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2001Change - miscellaneouspublished on 22.08.2001 [2001/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aktiebolaget Hässle
Kärragatan 5
S-431 83 Mölndal / SE
[1987/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Lövgren, Kurt Ingmar
Violinvägen 2D
S-435 00 Mölnlycke / SE
02 / Pilbrant, Ake Gunnar
Snödroppevägen 6
S-434 00 Kungsbacka / SE
03 / Yasumura, Mitsuru
37, Matsuzono 5-chome
Nishinomiya Hyogo 662 / JP
04 / Morigaki, Satoshi
275-84, Nakanoma Yachiyo-cho
Taka-gun Hyogo 677-01 / JP
05 / Oda, Minoru
304-24, Ohaza-Yuya
Nakatsu-shi Ohita 871 / JP
06 / Ohishi, Naohiro
1342-1, Ohaza-Tarumi Shinyoshitomimura
Chikujo-gun Fukuoka 871-09 / JP
[1987/49]
Representative(s)Linderoth, Margareta , et al
AstraZenaca AB Global Intellectual Property
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [1994/25]Linderoth, Margareta , et al
AB Astra Patent Department
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Former [1994/22]Goldin, Douglas Michael
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [1991/16]Linderoth, Margareta
AB Astra Patent Department
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Former [1987/49]Näsman, Rune B. G.
AB Astra Patent and Trade Mark Department
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Application number, filing date87850127.916.04.1987
[1987/49]
Priority number, dateGB1986001057230.04.1986         Original published format: GB 8610572
[1987/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0247983
Date:02.12.1987
Language:EN
[1987/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0247983
Date:19.10.1988
Language:EN
[1988/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0247983
Date:07.01.1993
Language:EN
[1993/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.1988
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/44, A61K9/30, A61K9/54
[1987/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/49]
TitleGerman:Arzneizubereitung zur oralen Anwendung[1987/49]
English:New pharmaceutical preparation for oral use[1987/49]
French:Préparation pharmaceutique pour utilisation orale[1987/49]
MiscellaneousEPB 2001/34: Teilanmeldung 92107179.1 eingereicht am 16/04/87
EPB 2001/34: Divisional application 92107179.1 filed on 16/04/87
EPB 2001/34: Demande divisionnaire 92107179.1 déposée le 16/04/87
EPB 1993/01: Teilanmeldung 92107179.1 eingereicht am 16/04/87
EPB 1993/01: Divisional application 92107179.1 filed on 16/04/87
EPB 1993/01: Demande divisionnaire 92107179.1 déposée le 16/04/87
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
01.05.1987Examination requested  [1987/49]
27.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.1990Request for accelerated examination filed
12.04.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
24.06.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
03.07.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1992Fee for grant paid
03.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP92107179.1  / EP0496437
EP93201611.6  / EP0567201
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.1993  22.02.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Laredo, Jack Joseph
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 02  05.10.1993  13.10.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Klaus-Ingo Arnstadt
Schneeglöckchenstrasse 55
80955 MüNCHEN / DE
Opponent's representative
Fürniss, Peter
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner
Röss, Kaiser, Polte
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
 03  05.10.1993  13.10.1993  ADMISSIBLE
STEVEN MICHAEL RABIN
7800 Fox Gate Court, Bethesda
Maryland 20817 / US
Opponent's representative
WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [1993/47]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.1993  22.02.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Laredo, Jack Joseph
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 02  05.10.1993  13.10.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Klaus-Ingo Arnstadt
Schneeglöckchenstrasse 55
80955 MüNCHEN / DE
Opponent's representative
Fürniss, Peter, Dr.
Kuhnen, Wacker & Partner Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
D-85354 Freising / DE
 03  05.10.1993  13.10.1993  ADMISSIBLE
STEVEN MICHAEL RABIN
7800 Fox Gate Court, Bethesda
Maryland 20817 / US
Opponent's representative
W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [1993/10]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.1993  22.02.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Laredo, Jack Joseph
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
08.02.1993No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
12.10.1993No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
12.10.1993No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
16.11.1993No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
04.07.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.08.1994Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
15.08.1994Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1996/09]
15.10.1994Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1995/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Licence(s)ID:01 00/not-exclusive
For:[FR]
Licencee:LABORATOIRES ASTRA FRANCE
Avenir Ouest 64, rue du 8 mai 1945
92025 Nanterre / FR
Date:17.11.1992
Former [1993/01]ID:01 00/not-exclusive
For:[FR]
Licencee:LABORATOIRES ASTRA FRANCE
Avenir Ouest 64, rue du 8 mai 1945
92025 Nanterre / FR
Date:
Documents cited:Search[A]JP5920219  ;
 [X]EP0124495  (HAESSLE AB [SE]);
 [Y]EP0080602  (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]);
 [Y]GB760403  (ABBOTT LAB);
 [Y]FR2272639  (WARREN ALLISTER [ZA]);
 [A]DE3233764  (SCHERER GMBH R P [DE]);
 [A]GB1190387  (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 106 (C-223)[1543], 18th May 1984; & JP-A-59 20 219 (SHINETSU KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 01-02-1984,
Examination   - SCAND. J. GASTROENTEROLOGY, vol.20, supplement 108, 1985*,
    - BROCHURE on HPMC TC-5 (Shinetsu Chemical)*,
    - UP TO DATE PHRAMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY, series no. 1: Coating of Drugs, 1969*,
    - Int. J. OF PHARMACEUTICS, vol. 31, 1986; pp. 131-136*,
    - ACTA CHEMICA SCANDINAVICA, vol. 43, 1989, no. 6; pp. 536-611 (reprint)*,