Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0273026

EP0273026 - Solvents for Photoresist compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1988/26]Photoresist processes, compositions and components
[1996/37]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIPLEY COMPANY INC.
2300 Washington Street
Newton, Massachusetts 02162 / US
[1989/39]
Former [1988/26]For all designated states
ASPECT SYSTEMS CORPORATION
45 Milk Street
Boston Massachusetts 02109 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Daniels, Brian Kenneth
15376 Timber Hill Lane
Chesterfield Missouri 63017 / US
02 / Madoux, David Charles
117 Franke Street
Maryland Heights Missouri 63043 / US
03 / Templeton, Michael Karpovich
11100 Graben Drive No.P
St.Louis Missouri 63074 / US
04 / Trefonas III, Peter
1559 Meadowside Drive
St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US
05 / Woodbrey, James Calvin
339 Ridge Trail Drive
Chesterfield Missouri 63017 / US
06 / Zampini, Anthony
1965 Beacon Grove Drive
St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US
[1997/04]
Former [1988/26]01 / Daniels, Brian Kenneth
15376 Timber Hill Lane
Chesterfield Missouri 63017 / US
02 / Madoux, David Charles
117 Franke Street
Maryland Heights Missouri 63043 / US
03 / Templeton, Michael Karpovich
11100 Graben Drive No.P
St.Louis Missouri 63074 / US
04 / Trefonas III, Peter
1559 Meadowside Drive
St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US
05 / Woodbrey, James Calvin
339 Ridge Trail Drive
Chesterfield Missouri 63017 / US
06 / Zampani, Anthony
1965 Beacon Grove Drive
St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US
Representative(s)Bunke, Holger , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]Bunke, Holger, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Former [1989/39]Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7
D-81241 München / DE
Former [1988/26]McLean, Peter
Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1
B-1150 Brussels / BE
Application number, filing date87870199.422.12.1987
[1988/26]
Priority number, dateUS1986000236423.12.1986         Original published format: US 2364
US1987010819213.10.1987         Original published format: US 108192
[1988/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0273026
Date:29.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0273026
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0273026
Date:11.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/37]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0273026
Date:20.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1990
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/004, G03F7/022
[1996/37]
Former International [1988/26]G03F7/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1988/26]
TitleGerman:Lösungsmittel für Photolack-Zusammensetzungen[1996/37]
English:Solvents for Photoresist compositions[1996/37]
French:Solvants pour compositions de photoréserve[1996/37]
Former [1988/26]Photolack-Verfahren, -Zusammensetzungen und -Bestandteile
Former [1988/26]Photoresist processes, compositions and components
Former [1988/26]Procédé photoréserve, compositions et ingrédients
MiscellaneousEPB 2003/34: (deleted)
EPB 2003/34: (deleted)
EPB 2003/34: (deleted)
EPB 1996/37: Teilanmeldung 96102977.4 eingereicht am 28/02/96
EPB 1996/37: Divisional application 96102977.4 filed on 28/02/96
EPB 1996/37: Demande divisionnaire 96102977.4 déposée le 28/02/96
Examination procedure07.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/06]
06.07.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.12.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.1996Fee for grant paid
14.06.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP96102977.4  / EP0718693
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.06.1997  20.06.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant GmbH
Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
 02  11.06.1997  27.06.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Japan Synthetic Rubber Co. Ltd.
11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo/Japan / JP
Opponent's representative
Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/18]
Opponent(s)01  09.06.1997  20.06.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen
Gebäude K 801
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  11.06.1997  27.06.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Japan Synthetic Rubber Co. Ltd.
11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo/Japan / JP
Opponent's representative
Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [1998/51]
Opponent(s)01  09.06.1997  20.06.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen
Gebäude K 801
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  11.06.1997  27.06.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Japan Synthetic Rubber Co. Ltd.
11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo/Japan / JP
Opponent's representative
Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [1997/33]
Opponent(s)01  09.06.1997  20.06.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Hoechst AG Zentrale Patentabt., Standort Kalle-Albert
Rheingaustr. 190-196
65203 WIESBADEN / DE
 02  11.06.1997   
Japan Synthetic Rubber Co. Ltd.
11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo/Japan / JP
Opponent's representative
Bühling, Gerhard
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [1997/32]
Opponent(s)01  09.06.1997  20.06.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Hoechst AG Zentrale Patentabt., Standort Kalle-Albert
Rheingaustr. 190-196
65203 WIESBADEN / DE
21.07.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.03.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.10.1999Date of oral proceedings
19.11.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.11.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.06.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.01.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.05.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition14.01.2000Appeal received No.  T0112/00
28.03.2000Statement of grounds filed
26.06.2002Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
26.06.2002Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:21.04.1994Request for further processing filed
21.04.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.05.1994Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
09.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
16.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
14.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES23.12.1997
[2004/28]
Former [2004/14]ES13.01.1998
Documents cited:Search[A]US4626492  (EILBECK JAMES N [US]);
 [A]EP0176871  (HOECHST CO AMERICAN [US]);
 [A]EP0070624  ;
 [A]EP0164620  (HOECHST CO AMERICAN [US])
OppositionEP0211667
 EP0239423
 EP0227487
 DE2818451
 GB2023858
 US3635709
 US5128230
 JPH02729284
    - "LSI Process Engineering", Ohm Sha. 25.10.82 and English translation thereof
    - Solid State Technology, vol. 25, no. 9, September 1982, pages 82-86