Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0273026 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0273026



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1463
06.05.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
20.08.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 3
06.05.2003 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
06.05.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
06.05.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
31.01.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
31.01.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
31.01.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
31.01.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
31.01.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 18
29.07.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.07.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.07.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.07.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.07.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.07.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.06.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.06.2002 Claims Appeal 2
26.06.2002 Claims Appeal 3
26.06.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 24
26.06.2002 Description Appeal 16
26.06.2002 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
31.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.05.2002 Claims Appeal 3
27.05.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
27.05.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
25.05.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.03.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.02.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
28.02.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
28.02.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
27.02.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
19.02.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.03.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
15.03.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
15.03.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.01.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
20.10.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.10.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.10.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.10.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.08.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.08.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.08.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.04.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.03.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
24.02.2000 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
09.02.2000 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
08.02.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.02.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.02.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.02.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.02.2000 Processing of an appeal Opposition 1
14.01.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.11.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.11.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.11.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.11.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
19.11.1999 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
19.11.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 14
19.11.1999 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.11.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.11.1999 Text intended for grant Opposition 18
12.10.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
12.10.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
12.10.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
12.10.1999 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
12.10.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.10.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.10.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.10.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.10.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
29.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
31.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.08.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
26.08.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.08.1999 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
13.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
13.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
13.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
13.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
13.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
13.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
13.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
13.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
13.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
12.08.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 34
12.08.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
12.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
08.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.04.1999 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
27.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.11.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.11.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.11.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.11.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
13.11.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.11.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.11.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.1998 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
29.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.10.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.10.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.10.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.10.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.10.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.10.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.10.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.10.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
13.10.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
11.05.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
11.05.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
11.05.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.05.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.03.1998 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.03.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
05.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.02.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.01.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.12.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.12.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.12.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.11.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.07.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.07.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.07.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
01.07.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.06.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 91
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
11.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
11.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
11.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
11.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
11.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
09.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
11.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.12.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 20
26.11.1996 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
01.08.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.06.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.06.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.06.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.03.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
28.02.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.01.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.12.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.08.1995 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.07.1995 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.05.1995 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.04.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
18.04.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 52
27.03.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
15.12.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
15.12.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.11.1994 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.11.1994 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.05.1994 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
21.04.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
21.04.1994 Description Search / examination 49
21.04.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.04.1994 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
21.02.1994 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.01.1994 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
07.01.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.11.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.11.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.07.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.04.1990 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.04.1990 European search report Search / examination 2
08.08.1989 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
08.08.1989 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
21.07.1989 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
21.07.1989 Request for assignment Search / examination 4
18.05.1988 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.01.1988 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
26.01.1988 Priority document Search / examination 92
12.01.1988 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
12.01.1988 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.12.1987 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.12.1987 Claims Search / examination 13
22.12.1987 Description Search / examination 77
22.12.1987 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.1987 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.1987 Drawings Search / examination 3
22.12.1987 Priority document Search / examination 99
22.12.1987 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5