blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0258392

EP0258392 - APPARATUS FOR IONTOPHORETIC DRUG-DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1988/10]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IONTOPHORETIC DRUG-DELIVERY
[1994/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.1995
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALZA Corporation
950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950 Palo Alto
California 94303-0802 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/40]For all designated states
ALZA CORPORATION
950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950
Palo Alto California 94303-0802 / US
Former [1992/32]For all designated states
ALZA CORPORATION
950 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto CA 94303-0802 / US
Former [1992/23]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
Former [1991/42]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue, N.E.
Minneapolis Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
Former [1988/10]For all designated states
Key Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2000 Galloping Hills Road
Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SANDERSON, John, E.
2620 N.E. 135th Street
North Miami, FL 33138 / US
02 / DE RIEL, Stanton, R.
550 N.W. 99th Way
Pembroke Pines, FL 33024 / US
[1988/10]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/11]Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Former [1992/32]Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr.
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Former [1988/10]Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr.
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date87901834.911.02.1987
[1988/10]
WO1987US00250
Priority number, dateUS1986082879412.02.1986         Original published format: US 828794
[1988/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8704936
Date:27.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0258392
Date:09.03.1988
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1988/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0258392
Date:20.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.1987
ClassificationIPC:A61N1/30
[1988/10]
CPC:
A61N1/0444 (EP,US); A61N1/0448 (EP,US); A61M2037/0007 (EP,US);
A61N1/0436 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/10]
TitleGerman:APPARAT ZUR IONTOPHORETISCHEN BEHANDLUNG MIT MEDIKAMENTEN[1994/16]
English:APPARATUS FOR IONTOPHORETIC DRUG-DELIVERY[1994/16]
French:APPAREIL D'ADMINISTRATION IONTOPHORETIQUE DE MEDICAMENTS[1994/16]
Former [1988/10]METHODE UND APPARAT ZUR IONTOPHORETISCHEN BEHANDLUNG MIT MEDIKAMENTEN
Former [1988/10]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IONTOPHORETIC DRUG-DELIVERY
Former [1988/10]PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ADMINISTRATION IONTOPHORETIQUE DE MEDICAMENTS
Entry into regional phase08.10.1987National basic fee paid 
08.10.1987Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1987Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1987Examination requested  [1988/10]
26.09.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.11.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.1992Fee for grant paid
04.06.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination30.09.1992Appeal received No.  T1073/92
11.02.1993Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)21.01.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15]
Request for further processing for:12.07.1991Request for further processing filed
12.07.1991Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.08.1991Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchUS4166457  [ ] (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al);
 EP0011813  [ ] (MOTION CONTROL INC [US]);
 EP0058920  [ ] (MOTION CONTROL INC [US]);
 EP0082728  [ ] (FRANTZ MEDICAL DEV LTD [US]);
 EP0182520  [ ] (MEDTRONIC INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.