Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0268615

EP0268615 - SYSTEM FOR A PORTABLE DATA CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  09.06.2000
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1988/22]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERL, Ewald, Christoph
211 Cherry Tree Lane
Middletown, NJ 07748 / US
02 / FRANKEL, Oren
52A Raleigh Court, East
Ocean Township, NJ 07712 / US
03 / ZAHIVI, Avi
120 Donaldson Street
Highland Park, NJ 08904 / US
[1988/22]
Representative(s)Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 OTU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/22]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date87903155.720.04.1987
[1988/22]
WO1987US00912
Priority number, dateUS1986086397316.05.1986         Original published format: US 863973
[1988/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8707062
Date:19.11.1987
Language:EN
[1987/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0268615
Date:01.06.1988
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1987
[1988/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0268615
Date:24.06.1992
Language:EN
[1992/26]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0268615
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1987
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10
[1988/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1988/22]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM FÜR EINEN TRAGBAREN DATENTRÄGER[1988/22]
English:SYSTEM FOR A PORTABLE DATA CARRIER[1988/22]
French:SYSTEME POUR SUPPORTS PORTATIFS DE DONNEES[1988/22]
Entry into regional phase07.01.1988National basic fee paid 
07.01.1988Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.1988Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.1988Examination requested  [1988/28]
07.08.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.12.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.1992Fee for grant paid
18.02.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.03.1993  08.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH
Euckenstrasse 12
D-81369 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1993/41]
Opponent(s)01  29.03.1993  08.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH
Euckenstrasse 12
D-81369 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
D-80797 München / DE
Former [1993/20]
Opponent(s)01  29.03.1993   
GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH
Euckenstrasse 12
D-81369 München / DE
06.05.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.11.1993Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.1993Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
29.03.1994Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
26.10.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.10.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.02.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.05.2000Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition28.03.1995Appeal received No.  T0278/95
05.06.1995Statement of grounds filed
26.10.1999Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
26.10.1999Date of oral proceedings
16.11.1999Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL24.06.1992
[2003/07]
Former [2002/02]AT24.06.1992
CH24.06.1992
LI24.06.1992
Former [2001/17]AT24.06.1992
Cited inInternational searchEP0159539  [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 US4211919  [ ] (UGON MICHEL [FR]);
 EP0152024  [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 EP0190733  [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 EP0057602  [ ] (CHALMERS DAVID ARTHUR [GB], et al)
OppositionWO8706747
 DE2738113
 DE2852941
 DE2837201
 EP0128362
    - UNIX, Concepts and Applications. Th. Kreifelts and P. Schnupp, B.G. Teubner, Stuttgart 1983