blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0317566

EP0317566 - WEB-LIKE FILL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.1992
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROSENDAHL, Gösta
Brännkyrkagatan 68
117 23 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1989/22]For all designated states
ROSENDAHL, Gösta
Brännkyrkagatan 68
S-117 23 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1989/22]
Representative(s)Grahn, Thomas Oscar, et al
AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn Box 23101
104 35 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1989/22]Grahn, Thomas, et al
Oscar Grahn Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 19540 Döbelnsgatan 58
S-104 32 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date87904984.908.07.1987
[1989/22]
WO1987SE00330
Priority number, dateSE1986000315717.07.1986         Original published format: SE 8603157
[1989/22]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8800630
Date:28.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0317566
Date:31.05.1989
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1989/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0317566
Date:24.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE28.01.1988
ClassificationIPC:E04B1/78, // B63C7/12
[1989/22]
CPC:
E04B1/78 (EP,US); E04B1/0007 (EP,US); Y10T428/1338 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US); Y10T428/231 (EP,US); Y10T428/234 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24562 (EP,US); Y10T428/24661 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/22]
TitleGerman:FÜLLUNGSELEMENT IN BANDFORM[1989/22]
English:WEB-LIKE FILL ELEMENT[1989/22]
French:ELEMENT DE REMPLISSAGE EN FORME DE BANDE[1989/22]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Entry into regional phase02.02.1988Translation filed 
12.01.1989National basic fee paid 
12.01.1989Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.1989Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.1988Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE
12.01.1989Examination requested  [1989/22]
08.05.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.09.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.1990Fee for grant paid
18.12.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.01.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.04.1991
BE24.04.1991
CH24.04.1991
FR24.04.1991
IT24.04.1991
LI24.04.1991
NL24.04.1991
SE24.04.1991
GB24.07.1991
LU31.07.1991
[2006/14]
Former [1999/52]AT24.04.1991
BE24.04.1991
CH24.04.1991
IT24.04.1991
LI24.04.1991
NL24.04.1991
SE24.04.1991
GB24.07.1991
LU31.07.1991
FR20.09.1991
Former [1999/42]AT24.04.1991
BE24.04.1991
CH24.04.1991
IT24.04.1991
LI24.04.1991
NL24.04.1991
SE24.04.1991
GB24.07.1991
FR20.09.1991
Former [1992/34]AT24.04.1991
BE24.04.1991
CH24.04.1991
LI24.04.1991
NL24.04.1991
SE24.04.1991
GB24.07.1991
FR20.09.1991
Former [1992/20]AT24.04.1991
BE24.04.1991
CH24.04.1991
LI24.04.1991
NL24.04.1991
SE24.04.1991
FR20.09.1991
Former [1992/18]AT24.04.1991
BE24.04.1991
CH24.04.1991
LI24.04.1991
NL24.04.1991
SE24.04.1991
Former [1992/03]AT24.04.1991
CH24.04.1991
LI24.04.1991
NL24.04.1991
SE24.04.1991
Former [1992/02]CH24.04.1991
LI24.04.1991
SE24.04.1991
Former [1991/48]SE24.04.1991
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1212506  ;
 [X]FR1602687  ;
 [X]CA1054326  (PAQUETTE ROLLAND);
 [A]DE1658907  (KAISER WILLY)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.