Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0296179

EP0296179 - TELELINK MONITORING AND REPORTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.1995
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.1995 [1995/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PepsiCo, Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase
New York 10577 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/52]For all designated states
PEPSICO INC.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, New York 10577 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CEDRONE, Louis, A.
55 Howard Avenue
Eastchester, NY 10708 / US
02 / SOBODOWSKI, Joseph, J.
10605 S.W. 135 Court
Miami, FL 33186 / US
[1988/52]
Representative(s)Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/52]Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09
D-80066 München / DE
Application number, filing date87905523.410.08.1987
[1988/52]
WO1987US01944
Priority number, dateUS1987000003602.01.1987         Original published format: US 36
[1988/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8805194
Date:14.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0296179
Date:28.12.1988
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.1988
[1988/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0296179
Date:12.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.07.1988
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.1991
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/20, G07F11/00
[1988/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/52]
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGS- UND RAPPORTIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT FERNVERBINDUNG[1988/52]
English:TELELINK MONITORING AND REPORTING SYSTEM[1988/52]
French:SYSTEME CONTROLEUR ET RAPPORTEUR POUR SYSTEME ELECTRONIQUE[1988/52]
Entry into regional phase31.08.1988National basic fee paid 
31.08.1988Search fee paid 
31.08.1988Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.1988Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.1988Examination requested  [1988/52]
28.07.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.03.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.1994Fee for grant paid
23.06.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
11.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
09.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4241237  (BUSHMAN W THOMAS [US], et al);
 [A]US4354613  (DESAI MAHENDRAKUMAR D, et al);
 [A]US4369442  (WERTH ROBERT L [US], et al);
 [Y]US4412292  (SEDAM JASON K [US], et al);
 [A]US4593361  (OTTEN DAVID M [US]);
 [Y]US4616323  (HAYASHI YUKICHI [JP]);
 [AP]US4654800  (HAYASHI YUKICHI [JP], et al);
 [YP]US4674055  (OGAKI HIROKAZU [JP], et al)