Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0326553 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0326553



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 325
29.11.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
13.11.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.09.1995 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.09.1995 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.07.1995 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
19.07.1995 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
19.07.1995 French translation of claims Opposition 2
08.05.1995 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
08.05.1995 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
08.05.1995 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
28.04.1995 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
27.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.03.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.03.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.03.1995 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 15
15.03.1995 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
14.03.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.03.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.03.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.03.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.03.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
31.01.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
31.01.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.01.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
31.01.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
31.01.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
31.01.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.01.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.01.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.01.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.01.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.01.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.01.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.03.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.02.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
07.02.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.01.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
22.11.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.11.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
04.10.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.10.1993 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
25.09.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
24.09.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
24.05.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.05.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
03.04.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.04.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 13
11.02.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.02.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.02.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.02.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.02.1993 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
04.02.1993 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.1993 Means of redress Opposition 1
04.02.1993 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
18.01.1993 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 3
16.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1992 Claims Opposition 1
10.11.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.10.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.10.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
21.10.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
21.10.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.09.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.09.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
14.05.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.05.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.04.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.04.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.04.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.04.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.04.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.04.1992 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.04.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.03.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.1992 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.02.1992 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
20.12.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.10.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.10.1991 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.07.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Request for documents Opposition 1
11.07.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.07.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
01.07.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.01.1991 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
19.11.1990 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.09.1990 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.09.1990 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.09.1990 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
04.07.1990 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
21.06.1990 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.02.1990 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.02.1990 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
11.01.1990 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
28.06.1989 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.02.1989 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
10.08.1988 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
10.08.1988 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
10.08.1988 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
31.05.1988 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
29.03.1988 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
29.03.1988 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14
23.03.1988 Priority document Search / examination 12
22.03.1988 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.09.1987 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1