Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0335865

EP0335865 - FASTENING DEVICE FOR SUPPORT STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.1992
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.08.1992 [1992/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BEAULIEU, Bryan J.
1205 132nd Street West
Burnsville, MN 55337 / US
[1989/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1989/41]
Representative(s)Miller, Joseph , et al
J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn
London WC1R 4JH / GB
[1989/45]
Former [1989/41]Miller, Joseph
J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn
London WC1R 4JH / GB
Application number, filing date87906499.626.08.1987
[1989/41]
WO1987US02157
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8902035
Date:09.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0335865
Date:11.10.1989
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1989
[1989/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0335865
Date:21.08.1991
Language:EN
[1991/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.03.1989
ClassificationInternational:F16B12/40
[1989/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/41]
TitleGerman:BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE GESTELLANORDNUNG[1989/41]
English:FASTENING DEVICE FOR SUPPORT STRUCTURES[1989/41]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ATTACHE POUR STRUCTURES DE SUPPORT[1989/41]
Entry into regional phase21.06.1989National basic fee paid 
21.06.1989Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.1989Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1989Examination requested  [1989/42]
09.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.02.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.1991Fee for grant paid
10.05.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.06.1989AT   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989BE   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989CH   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989DE   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989LU   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989NL   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
21.06.1989SE   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1989
Cited inInternational searchAU444424  [ ];
 FR1361398  [ ];
 US3797948  [ ];
 DE2348239  [ ];
 US2926941  [ ]