blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0332623

EP0332623 - PHYSICAL PROCESS FOR SIMULTANEOUS DEODORIZATION AND CHOLESTEROL REDUCTION OF FATS AND OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.12.1999
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL MILLS, INC.
9200 Wayzata Boulevard
Minneapolis, MN 55426 / US
[1989/38]
Inventor(s)01 / MARSCHNER, Steven, S.
2800 Girard Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US
02 / FINE, Jeffrey, B.
2925 Raleigh Avenue South
St. Louis Park, MN 55416 / US
[1989/38]
Representative(s)Tauchner, Paul, et al
Vossius & Partner
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/22]Tauchner, Paul, Dr., et al
Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [1989/38]Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date87907207.220.10.1987
[1989/38]
WO1987US02738
Priority number, dateUS1986092118421.10.1986         Original published format: US 921184
US1987002061302.03.1987         Original published format: US 20613
[1989/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8802989
Date:05.05.1988
Language:EN
[1988/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0332623
Date:20.09.1989
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1989/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0332623
Date:29.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.05.1988
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:A23D7/00, C11B3/00
[1996/22]
CPC:
A23C15/145 (EP,US); A23D7/003 (EP,US); A23D9/00 (EP,US);
C11B3/14 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1989/38]A23D5/00, C11B3/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1989/38]
TitleGerman:PHYSIKALISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR DESODORIERUNG UND ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN CHOLESTERIN-REDUZIERUNG VON FETTEN UND ÖLEN[1996/22]
English:PHYSICAL PROCESS FOR SIMULTANEOUS DEODORIZATION AND CHOLESTEROL REDUCTION OF FATS AND OILS[1989/38]
French:PROCEDE PHYSIQUE DE DESODORISATION ET DE REDUCTION SIMULTANEES DU CHOLESTEROL CONTENU DANS DES GRAISSES ET DES HUILES[1989/38]
Former [1989/38]PHYSIKALISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR DESODORISIERUNG UND ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN CHOLESTERIN-REDUZIERUNG VON FETTEN UND ÖLEN
Entry into regional phase20.04.1989National basic fee paid 
20.04.1989Search fee paid 
20.04.1989Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.1989Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.1988Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
20.04.1989Examination requested  [1989/38]
20.02.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.05.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.09.1995Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
30.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.1996Fee for grant paid
08.03.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.03.1997  12.03.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455 /
Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Sikken, Antonius H. J. M.
Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2008/32]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.1997  12.03.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Sikken, Antonius H. J. M.
Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [1997/17]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.1997   
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
NL - 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Sikken, Antonius H. J. M.
Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
09.04.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.10.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.1997Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
23.04.1998Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
15.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.1999Reply to a communication from the opposition division
31.08.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
10.09.1999Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/03]
07.06.2002Date of oral proceedings
26.06.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition28.07.2000Appeal received No.  T1065/00
28.07.2000Statement of grounds filed
07.06.2002Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible
Request for further processing for:17.11.1995Request for further processing filed
17.11.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.12.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
04.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199509   M06   Fee paid on   04.03.1996
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE21.10.1996
BE31.10.1996
CH31.10.1996
LI31.10.1996
FR30.06.1999
DE03.08.1999
[2000/24]
Former [2000/20]SE21.10.1996
BE31.10.1996
CH31.10.1996
LI31.10.1996
DE03.08.1999
Former [1998/11]SE21.10.1996
BE31.10.1996
CH31.10.1996
LI31.10.1996
Former [1998/04]BE31.10.1996
CH31.10.1996
LI31.10.1996
Former [1997/49]BE31.10.1996
Cited inInternational search[A]US2804427  (SURIANO JACK F);
 [A]US3506696  (BAKER JOSEPH S, et al);
 [X]US4093540  (SEN GUPTA ACHINTYA KUMAR)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.